Maryland District Court
Judge:Richard D Bennett
Case #: 1:22-cv-02153
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2022
Terminated:Mar 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 21, 2023 4:29 AM EST
Defendant
Variety Stores, Inc.
218 S. Garnett Street P.O. Box 947 Drawer 947
Henderson, NC 27536
Represented By
Frank L Lipshultz
Zauner And Mtimet PA
contact info
Defendant
Variety Wholesalers, Inc.
218 South Garnett Street
Henderson, NC 27536
Represented By
Frank L Lipshultz
Zauner And Mtimet PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Gwendolyn Spruill
2919 Fleetwood Avenue
Baltimore, MD 21214
Represented By
Seann Patrick Malloy
Malloy Law Offices LLC
contact info
Natalie Wendy Selzer
Malloy Law Office, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
17 17 order Settlement Order Tue 03/14 1:39 PM
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/14/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 03/14 1:15 PM
Settlement Conference held on 3/14/2023 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (stds, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Thu 01/12 10:17 AM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 1/12/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/11 4:18 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for ADR Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/11/2023. (chs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 01/09 3:58 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by Variety Stores, Inc.(Lipshultz, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
12 12 service Certificate of Service Tue 11/22 2:50 PM
-FILED IN ERROR- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Variety Stores, Inc. of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures (Lipshultz, Frank) Modified on 11/22/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 11/22 3:42 PM
QC NOTICE:12 Certificate of Service filed by Variety Stores, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Discovery, including Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures, should not be filed with the Court pursuant to Local Rule 104. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
11 11 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/01 3:40 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/9/2023. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/25/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Informal Discovery Letter
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 09/01 9:09 AM
QC NOTICE:9 Response filed by Variety Wholesalers, Inc., Variety Stores, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Please refile using the event Answers to Complaints. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
9 9 respm Response Wed 08/31 4:28 PM
RESPONSE re4 Amended Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Variety Stores, Inc., Variety Wholesalers, Inc..(Lipshultz, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Thu 08/25 1:09 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/25 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Variety Wholesalers, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of filing of state court discovery material Thu 08/25 1:06 PM
Notice of filing of state court discovery material (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Service for Discovery Filing,
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Designation of Experts
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/25 1:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Variety Stores, Inc., Variety Wholesalers, Inc., filed by Gwendolyn Spruill. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/25 1:04 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Variety Wholesalers, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 08/25 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Variety Stores, Inc., filed by Gwendolyn Spruill. (ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/25/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Information Report
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 08/25 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY, case number 24-c-21-004846 OT. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10120165), filed by Variety Wholesalers, Inc., Variety Stores, Inc..(Lipshultz, Frank) Modified on 8/25/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet USDC Civil Cover Sheet, -FILED IN ERROR-
Att: 2 Supplement Corporate Disclosure,
Att: 3 Supplement Notice to State Court Removal,
Att: 4 Supplement Variety Stores Corporate Docs,
Att: 5 Supplement Variety Wholesalers Corporate Docs,
Att: 6 Supplement State Court Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Supplement State Court Original Court,
Att: 8 Supplement State Court Line to Reissue Summons,
Att: 9 Supplement State Court Ans. to Complaint,
Att: 10 Supplement State Court Order Scheduling,
Att: 11 Supplement State Court Order Neutral Evaluator,
Att: 12 Supplement State Court Plaintiff's 1st Expert Designatiion,
Att: 13 Supplement State Court Not. Service RFA Ints RPD,
Att: 14 Supplement State Court Plaintiff's 2nd Expert Designation,
Att: 15 Supplement State Court Plaintiff's Amended Complaint,
Att: 16 Supplement State Court Certified Docket Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/25 12:42 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - State Court Docs Thu 08/25 1:09 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 08/25 1:12 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Variety Wholesalers, Inc., Variety Stores, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Corporate Disclosure Statement should not be filed as an attachment to the Notice of Removal. Please refile using the event under Other Documents > Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. The attachment has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]