Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: Kathleen Kay
Case #: 2:22-cv-04142
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2022
Terminated:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 21, 2023 2:32 AM CST
Defendant
Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Certificate No LD606857-01
Represented By
Lynda Albano Tafaro
Wood Smith Et Al (no)
contact info
William Riley Carter
Wood Smith Et Al (no)
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy M Ardoin, Jr
Represented By
Galen M Hair
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys
contact info
Sophia J Johnson
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys
contact info
Special Master
Cade Richard Cole
Represented By
Cade Richard Cole
Law Office Of Cade R Cole
contact info
Special Master
Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By
Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Juneau David
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
14 14 appeal USCA Judgment Tue 07/18 4:02 PM
USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE (certified copy) as to12 Notice of Appeal filed by Tommy M Ardoin, Jr. that under 5th Cir. R. 42.3, the appeal is DISMISSED as of July 18, 2023, for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely file appellants brief. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
13 13 appeal USCA Order Mon 07/10 8:14 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER of USCA as to12 Notice of Appeal filed by Tommy M Ardoin, Jr that the court has granted an extension of time to and including July 7, 2023, for filing appellants brief in this case. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
appeal Appeal Record Certified to USCA Wed 04/26 11:43 AM
ELECTRONICALLY CERTIFIED Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re12 Notice of Appeal is now available to Appellate Counsel via the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals website. See Instructions for Access and Use of the Electronic Record Download Feature of CM/ECF by clicking[LINK:here] . (USCA 23-30189 If you do not have access to the Electronic Download Feature of CM/ECF, please submit your request for the certified record on appeal to the District Court. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
appeal USCA Case Number Thu 04/13 9:14 AM
USCA Case Number 23-30189 for12 Notice of Appeal filed by Tommy M Ardoin, Jr. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
Related: [-]
appeal ~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines Thu 04/13 9:16 AM
Set Deadline for Clerk re12 Notice of Appeal: Certify Appeal Record 23-30189 by Clerk to COA 4/27/2023. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
12 12 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 04/05 3:44 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to10 Memorandum Ruling,11 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by Tommy M Ardoin, Jr. (Filing fee $505, receipt number ALAWDC-5517630) (aty,Johnson, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 03/06 1:48 PM
JUDGMENT in accordance with the10 Memorandum Ruling, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process (Doc. 5) filed by Defendants, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Subscribing to certificate Number LD606857-01, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) is GRANTED dismissing this lawsuit without prejudice. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 3/6/2023. (crt,Benoit, T)
Related: [-]
10 10 6 pgs order Memorandum Ruling Mon 03/06 1:45 PM
MEMORANDUM RULING re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Certificate No LD606857-01. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 3/6/2023. (crt,Benoit, T)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
9 9 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Thu 02/16 12:53 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Certificate No LD606857-01. (aty,Carter, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Wed 02/15 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:5 Motion to Dismiss sent to William Riley Carter on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Certificate No LD606857-01. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 3/1/2023. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Motion Setting Wed 02/15 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding:5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 3/29/2023 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/15 3:57 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Certificate No LD606857-01 identifying Other Affiliates Syndicate No 510, Syndicate No 33, Syndicate No 1183, Syndicate No 1200, Syndicate No 4472 for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. (aty,Carter, William) Modified docket text on 2/15/2023 (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 02/15 2:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Certificate No LD606857-01.(Attorney William Riley Carter added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Certificate No LD606857-01(pty:dft))(aty,Carter, William). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 2/15/2023 (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - List of Syndicates,
Att: 4 Proposed order
Friday, December 16, 2022
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/16 10:56 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Mendes and Mount on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Certificate No LD606857-01 on 12/15/2022, filed by Tommy M Ardoin, Jr. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Certificate No LD606857-01 answer due 1/5/2023 (aty,Johnson, Sophia) Modified on 12/16/2022 to indicate answer due date (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Corrective Action Fri 12/16 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Sophia J Johnson on behalf of Tommy M Ardoin, Jr regarding4 Affidavit of Service. Action taken: Set answer due date of 1/5/2023 and modified docket text to indicate answer due date. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Thu 09/08 4:24 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Certificate No LD606857-01. (crt,Enkey, R)
Related: [-]
2 2 13 pgs order Order Thu 09/08 4:23 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021.(crt,Enkey, R)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/25 2:31 AM
COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Certificate No LD606857-01 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5237760) filed by Tommy M. Ardoin, Jr.(Attorney Sophia Juliana Johnson added to party Tommy M. Ardoin, Jr(pty:pla))(aty,Johnson, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/08 4:21 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Enkey, R)
Related: [-]