California Southern District Court
Judge:Michael M Anello
Referred: Jill L Burkhardt
Case #: 3:22-cv-01255
Nature of Suit195 Contract - Contract Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2022
Terminated:Jan 05, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 21, 2023 1:10 AM PST
Defendant
Rari Nutrition LLC
Plaintiff
Silver Weinholtz
Represented By
Charles C. Weller
Charles C. Weller, Esq.
contact info

GPO Sep 30 2022
ORDER Granting 3 Unopposed Motion to Stay all Deadlines Pending Finalization of Settlement. Accordingly, the Court STAYS this action for ninety (90) days, through 12/28/2022. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/30/2022. (tcf)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, January 05, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/05 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Silver Weinholtz (Weller, Charles) (ave)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/30 11:04 AM
ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Status Report - Status Report due by 1/13/2023. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/30/2022.(ave)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 09/30 11:17 AM
ORDER Granting3 Unopposed Motion to Stay all Deadlines Pending Finalization of Settlement. Accordingly, the Court STAYS this action for ninety (90) days, through 12/28/2022. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/30/2022. (tcf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
3 3 motion Stay Thu 09/29 11:30 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Silver Weinholtz. (Weller, Charles) (tcf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 08/25 9:33 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/25 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rari Nutrition LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17108675.), filed by Silver Weinholtz. The new case number is 3:22-cv-1255-MMA-JLB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Weller, Charles)(ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet