HAHN v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-16887 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:22-cv-01945 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 21, 2023 4:31 AM EST |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
CURTIS HAHN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CURTIS HAHN. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of CURTIS HAHN (REUTER, VINCE) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of CURTIS HAHN (REAMS, JARED) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of CURTIS HAHN (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) due by 9/14/2022 .) (djb) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-01945. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
6 | 6
![]() CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-175) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/25/2022.] |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal. (ABR) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/25/2022.] | |
4 | 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-1945 JRT/TNL. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/25/2022.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |