New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Referred: Robert W Lehrburger
Case #: 1:22-mc-00238
CauseM 08-85 Motion to Compel
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 24, 2024 2:49 PM EDT
Movant
Pandora Jewelry, LLC
Represented By
Emma K. Morehart
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Martha B Motley
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Terence William McCormick
Mintz & Gold LLP
contact info
Respondent
Blue Time, Inc.
Represented By
John Kilgard
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
William J. Thomashower
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Respondent
Solar Time, Inc.
Represented By
John Kilgard
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
William J. Thomashower
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
30 30 order Protective Order Tue 03/11 11:50 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/11/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
29 29 misc Proposed Protective Order Mon 03/10 1:22 PM
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC..(McCormick, Terence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/27 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Felicity Sloan Kohn on behalf of Blue Time, Inc., Solar Time, Inc...(Kohn, Felicity)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 15, 2025
27 27 7 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Tue 02/18 9:26 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for24 Report and Recommendations,1 Motion to Compel, filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC. For the foregoing reasons, the Court OVERRULES Respondents' objections to the R&R and ADOPTS the R&R in full. By March 10, 2025, the parties shall jointly propose a protective order consistent with this order and Judge Lehrburger's R&R. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 1. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/15/25) (yv) Modified on 2/18/2025 (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
26 26 21 pgs respoth Response (non-motion) Wed 03/13 11:34 AM
RESPONSE re:25 Objection to Report and Recommendations,24 Report and Recommendations,,, . Document filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC..(McCormick, Terence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
25 25 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Wed 02/28 11:59 PM
OBJECTION to24 Report and Recommendations Document filed by Blue Time, Inc., Solar Time, Inc...(Thomashower, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A CHart
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
24 24 order Report and Recommendations Wed 02/14 12:13 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: MOTION TO COMPEL re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Blue Time, Inc. and Solar Time, Inc. to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Maryland. Other Court Case Number: 1:21-cv-02973-SAG. Filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC. Pandora's motion to compel Respondents' compliance with the Subpoenas should be granted, and the Subpoena requests should be narrowed as set forth above. To the extent not discussed above, the Court has considered the parties' arguments and found them to be either moot or without merit. Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 2/14/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/31 3:03 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation): ECF No.1. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. Motions referred to Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/31/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
utility Case Designation Tue 01/30 11:29 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
22 22 misc Letter Wed 07/05 6:40 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Terence W. McCormick dated July 5, 2023 re: Pending Motion to Compel. Document filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC..(McCormick, Terence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
21 21 misc Letter Wed 06/28 12:09 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from William Thomashower dated 6/27/23 re: Pandora v. Blue Time et al.. Document filed by Blue Time, Inc., Solar Time, Inc...(Thomashower, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A Pandora 21-0172
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B Pandora 23-0640
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex C Pandora 21-2973
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
20 20 misc Letter Tue 06/13 11:04 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Terence W. McCormick dated June 13, 2023 re: Pending Motion to Compel. Document filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC..(McCormick, Terence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stay Order in Maryland Action
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
19 19 17 pgs respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 10/18 2:15 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Blue Time, Inc. and Solar Time, Inc. to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Maryland. Other Court Case Number: 1:21-cv-02973-SAG. (Fili . Document filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC..(McCormick, Terence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
18 18 20 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/28 12:10 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Blue Time, Inc. and Solar Time, Inc. to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Maryland. Other Court Case Number: 1:21-cv-02973-SAG. (Fili . Document filed by Blue Time, Inc., Solar Time, Inc...(Thomashower, William)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/28 12:03 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Blue Time, Inc., Solar Time, Inc...(Thomashower, William)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/28 12:00 AM
DECLARATION of Albert Metta in Opposition re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Blue Time, Inc. and Solar Time, Inc. to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Maryland. Other Court Case Number: 1:21-cv-02973-SAG. (Fili. Document filed by Blue Time, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Screen Captures).(Thomashower, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
15 15 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/27 11:59 PM
DECLARATION of Soly Chakalo in Opposition re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Blue Time, Inc. and Solar Time, Inc. to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Maryland. Other Court Case Number: 1:21-cv-02973-SAG. (Fili. Document filed by Solar Time, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Screen Captures, #2 Exhibit Ex B Group of Letters).(Thomashower, William)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/27 11:57 PM
DECLARATION of W. Thomashower in Opposition re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Blue Time, Inc. and Solar Time, Inc. to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Maryland. Other Court Case Number: 1:21-cv-02973-SAG. (Fili. Document filed by Blue Time, Inc., Solar Time, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Screen Capture).(Thomashower, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 09/15 9:01 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 12 MOTION for Emma K. Morehart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26675315. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/15 1:18 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Emma K. Morehart to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (CP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/14 10:07 AM
MOTION for Emma K. Morehart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26675315. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC..(Morehart, Emma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Emma K. Morehart,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, September 08, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 09/08 2:58 PM
ORDER: granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/08/2022) (ama)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 09/08 9:04 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 8 MOTION for Martha Brewer Motley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26644134. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/08 11:48 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Martha Brewer Motley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (CP)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/08 2:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/27/2022 Replies due by 10/18/2022. (ama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
9 9 motion Extension of Time Wed 09/07 6:11 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from William Thomashower dated 9/07/2022. Document filed by Blue Time, Inc., Solar Time, Inc...(Thomashower, William)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/07 12:46 PM
MOTION for Martha Brewer Motley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26644134. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC..(Motley, Martha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Martha Brewer Motley,
Att: 2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Friday, September 02, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/02 5:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Kilgard on behalf of Blue Time, Inc., Solar Time, Inc...(Kilgard, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/02 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William J. Thomashower on behalf of Blue Time, Inc., Solar Time, Inc...(Thomashower, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 08/26 9:24 AM
Case Designated ECF. (aea)
Related: [-]
notice Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 08/26 9:25 AM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(aea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
5 5 20 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 08/25 7:44 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Blue Time, Inc. and Solar Time, Inc. to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Maryland. Other Court Case Number: 1:21-cv-02973-SAG. (Fili . Document filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC..(McCormick, Terence)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 08/25 7:12 PM
DECLARATION of Martha Brewer Motley in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Blue Time, Inc. and Solar Time, Inc. to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Maryland. Other Court Case Number: 1:21-cv-02973-SAG. (Fili. Document filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in Pandora Jewelry v. John Does 1-10, #2 Exhibit Motions for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas, #3 Exhibit Orders Granting Leave to Serve Subpoenas, #4 Exhibit Subpoenas Served on Blue Time, Inc. and Solar Time, Inc., #5 Exhibit Respondents' Objections to Subpoenas, #6 Exhibit Emails re: Service of Subpoenas).(McCormick, Terence)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/25 6:29 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Pandora A/S, Corporate Parent Pandora Jewelry, Inc. for Pandora Jewelry, LLC. Document filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC..(McCormick, Terence)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Miscellaneous Cover Sheet Thu 08/25 6:15 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(McCormick, Terence)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Compel Thu 08/25 5:58 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Blue Time, Inc. and Solar Time, Inc. to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Maryland. Other Court Case Number: 1:21-cv-02973-SAG. (Filing Fee $ 49.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26596837)Document filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC.(McCormick, Terence)
Related: [-]