New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:22-cv-07309
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 22, 2023 4:16 AM EST
Defendant
Gaurav Anand
Represented By
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Harry You
Represented By
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Warsh
Represented By
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Benjamin Sun
Represented By
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Parker
Represented By
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Neil Mehta
Represented By
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bom Suk Kim
Represented By
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lydia Jett
Represented By
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Defendant
Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Defendant
Coupang, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Christensen
Represented By
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Allen & Company LLC
Movant
Alsar Ltd. Partnership
Represented By
Kim Elaine Miller
Kahn Swick & Foti, LLC
contact info
Movant
Rubin Lerer
Represented By
Phillip C. Kim
The Rosen Law Firm
contact info
Movant
New Mexico State Investment Council
Represented By
David Avi Rosenfeld
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (li)
contact info
Movant
New York City Public Pension Funds
Represented By
Emma Gilmore
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Movant
Office of the Treasurer of the State of North Carolina on behalf of the North Carolina Retirement Systems
Represented By
David Avi Rosenfeld
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (li)
contact info
Plaintiff
David Choi
Represented By
Samuel Howard Rudman
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (li)
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, August 19, 2024
91 91 misc Letter Mon 08/19 12:09 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Andrew Ehrlich dated August 19, 2024 re: Certified translation. Document filed by Gaurav Anand, Matthew Christensen, Coupang, Inc., Lydia Jett, Bom Suk Kim, Neil Mehta, Michael Parker, Benjamin Sun, Kevin Warsh, Harry You..(Ehrlich, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certified English Translation of 2024.02.01 Seoul High Court 7th Administrative Panel Decision
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
90 90 misc Letter Wed 08/14 3:08 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated August 14, 2024 re: Reply to Defendants' letters88 and89 regarding KFTC Decision. Document filed by New York City Public Pension Funds, The Board of Education Retirement System of The City of New York, The New York City Deferred Compensation Plan, The New York City Employees Retirement System, The New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, The New York City Police Pension Fund, The Teachers Retirement System of The City of New York, The Teachers Retirement System of The City of New York Variable Annuity Program..(Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
89 89 misc Letter Mon 08/12 11:52 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Andrew J. Ehrlich dated August 12, 2024 re: Defendants' Letter88 . Document filed by Gaurav Anand, Matthew Christensen, Coupang, Inc., Lydia Jett, Bom Suk Kim, Neil Mehta, Michael Parker, Benjamin Sun, Kevin Warsh, Harry You..(Ehrlich, Andrew)
Related: [-]