NII Funding Corp.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-12611
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-12611
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:14-bk-12615 |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | More than $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
NII Funding Corp.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 10/26 3:39 PM
Case Closed. (Lopez, Mary) |
||
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Final Decree Closing Debtors Jointly Administered Chapter 11 Cases signed on 10/18/2016 (White, Greg) |
|
Friday, September 19, 2014 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Fri 09/19 8:58 AM
Case Jointly Administered. An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of NII Holdings, Inc. and its direct and indirect debtor subsidiaries. The docket in the chapter 11 case of NII Holdings, Inc., Case No. 14-12611 (SCC), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Lopez, Mary) |
||
Tuesday, September 16, 2014 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases signed on 9/16/2014. (White, Greg) |
|
Monday, September 15, 2014 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration filed by Scott Greenberg on behalf of NII Funding Corp.. (Greenberg, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Scott Greenberg of Jones Day on behalf of NII Funding Corp.. (Greenberg, Scott) |
|
Judge Shelley C. Chapman added to the case. (Porter, Minnie). | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-12615 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10314122. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Add Judge
Mon 09/15 1:50 PM
Judge Shelley C. Chapman added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |