Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:22-cr-00367
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Aug 27, 2022 2:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Isaac Ambe Nformangum (1)
Represented By
Edward Michael Chernoff
Attorney At Law
contact info
Jonathan D Landers
Attorney At Law
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Houston
contact info
Ike Okorafor
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Richard Wesley Bennett
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/27/2022 3:05 AM CDT
Saturday, July 09, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum (1), filed. (gkelner, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
Arrest of Isaac Ambe Nformangum, filed. (gkelner, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
***Set Hearing as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum: Initial Appearance set for 7/11/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray (gkelner, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Isaac Ambe Nformangum. (jmarchand, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE Minute Entry for proceedings held on 7/11/2022 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum, Defendant first appearance on Complaint. (Deft informed of rights). Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial affidavit executed, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order appointing FPD to be entered, Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing to be entered. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 7/12/2022 at 11:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray Hearing condcuted by video with oral consent of defendant. Appearances: AUSA Shelley Hicks f/USA; AFPD Amr Ahmed f/Deft.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Yes) Deft remanded to custody, filed.(jmarchand, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Ike Okorafor, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum, filed.(Okorafor, Ike) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 7/9/2022; Returned Executed on 7/9/2022 as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum.. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (gkelner, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
3 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Isaac Ambe Nformangum, filed. [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmarchand, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 7/12/2022 at 11:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmarchand, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF RESETTING as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 7/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray, filed. (jmarchand, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION Minute Entry for proceedings held on 7/12/2022 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum Defendant appeared with counsel. Hearing continued, Defendant waives Preliminary and Waiver of Preliminary Hearing executed, Waiver of Preliminary executed on the record. Detention Hearing set for 7/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray Hearing conducted by video with oral consent of defendant. Appearances: Ike Okorafor appearing for Ike Okorafor appearing for AUSA Ike Okorafor appearing for Richard Ike Okorafor appearing for Bennett Ike Okorafor appearing for f/USA; Ike Okorafor appearing for.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Yes) Deft remanded to custody, filed.(jmarchand, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmarchand, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
8 8 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
DETENTION HEARING Minute Entry for proceedings held on 7/13/2022 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum Defendant appeared with counsel. Bond set, $100, 000 with $5,000 deposit and co-surety, Defendant advised of conditions of release, Surety signature(s) required, Defendant to be released after bond perfected. Hearing conducted by video with oral consent of defendant. Appearances: Ike Okorafor appearing for Ike Okorafor appearing for AUSA Ike Okorafor appearing for Richard Ike Okorafor appearing for Bennett Ike Okorafor appearing for f/USA; Ike Okorafor appearing for.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Yes) Deft remanded to custody, filed.(jmarchand, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
Bond payment received for Isaac Ambe Nformangum. Payment submitted by Catherine Nformangum in the amount of $5000.00. Receipt number # HOU110105, filed. (thanniable, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
9 9 FPD REQUEST as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum for Transcript of 07/13/22: Detention Hearing held before the Hon. Peter Bray (3-day turnaround request) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Meyers, Marjorie) Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 7/21/2022. Estimated completion date: 7/24/2022. Modified on 7/21/2022 (RachelWillborg, 4). [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
11 11 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum, filed. (pturner, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
12 12 Addendum to11 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum, filed. (pturner, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
13 13 Addendum as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum, filed. (pturner, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
14 14 Secured Bond Entered as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum in amount of $ 100,000 with $5,000 deposit,, filed. (jmarchand, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmarchand, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
Attorney update in case as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Houston and Ike Okorafor terminated. (jmarchand, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
16 16 Unopposed MOTION Motion To Substitute Counsel by Isaac Ambe Nformangum, filed.(Chernoff, Edward) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 PROPOSED ORDER re:16 Unopposed MOTION Motion To Substitute Counsel as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum, filed.(Chernoff, Edward) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER granting16 Motion Substitute Counsel as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray.) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
19 19 Arrest Warrant issued 7/9/2022; Returned Executed on 7/9/2022 as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum. Defendant was arrested in Houston, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (kpicota, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 24, 2022
20 20 TRANSCRIPT as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum re: Detention Hearing (Via Video) held on July 13, 2022 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray.Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Marjorie A. Meyers Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2022., filed. (mahenry, ) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
21 21 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to20 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (gclair, 4) [4:22-mj-01539]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum: Arraignment set for 8/9/2022 at 02:00 PM in by video before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo (thanniable, 4)
Related: [-]
22 22 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum (1) count(s) 1, 2, filed. (thanniable, 4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
23 23 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum, filed.(thanniable, 4)
Related: [-]
24 24 ORDER for Issuance of Summons as to Isaac Ambe Nformangum ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y Ho) Parties notified. (thanniable, 4)
Related: [-]