Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:22-mj-01873
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2022
Terminated:Aug 25, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Aug 27, 2022 2:40 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Susanna Martinez
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Katrina Alexa Mata (1)
Terminated: 08/25/2022
Represented By
Orlando Mondragon
Law Office Of Orlando Mondragon
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/27/2022 3:04 AM CDT
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
Arrest of Katrina Alexa Mata (bg2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Katrina Alexa Mata. By Judge Leon Schydlower. (mvda)
Related: [-]
1 1 ** DOCUMENT DEFICIENT ** NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Susanna Martinez appearing for USA. . Attorney Susanna Martinez added to party USA(pty:pla) (Martinez, Susanna) Modified on 7/28/2022 (bg2).
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower as to Katrina Alexa Mata. (bg2)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Katrina Alexa Mata. (bg2)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Katrina Alexa Mata. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mvda)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING ZOOM HEARING as to Katrina Alexa Mata. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mvda)
Related: [-]
6 6 Proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Initial Appearance as to Katrina Alexa Mata held on 7/28/2022 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 8/2/2022 09:45AM before Judge Leon Schydlower, Interpreter NOT required as to Katrina Alexa Mata (Court Reporter ERO.) (mvda)
Related: [-]
7 7 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA as to Katrina Alexa Mata. (bg2)
Related: [-]