California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:22-mj-02747
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Terminated:Aug 25, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Aug 28, 2022 12:30 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Francisco Anaya Nagel
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Vicky Sharareh Sharif (1)
Terminated: 08/25/2022
Represented By
Thomas Paul Matthews
Law Office Of Thomas P. Matthews
contact info
Ezekiel E. Cortez
contact info
LeRoy George Siddell
Law Office Of George Siddell
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/28/2022 12:47 AM PDT
Thursday, July 28, 2022
Arrest of Vicky Sharareh Sharif (no document attached) (cdw)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Vicky Sharareh Sharif.(cdw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Vicky Sharareh Sharif: Initial Appearance set for 7/29/2022 before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. (no document attached) (mme)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Initial Appearance as to Vicky Sharareh Sharif held on 7/29/2022. Financial Affidavit filed. It appears the defendant may have the ability to retain counsel. Supplemental financial affidavit is due at next court hearing. Attorney Ezekiel E. Cortez (n/a) provisionally appointed for Vicky Sharareh Sharif. Bond set as to Vicky Sharareh Sharif (1) $20,000 PS secured by 2 FRAs(1 related). Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 8/11/22 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Arraignment set for 8/25/22 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major.) (CD# 7/29/2022 BLM 22-1:2:00-2:24). (Plaintiff Attorney Bianca Calderon-Penaloza AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jamie Schmid FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
4 4 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Vicky Sharareh Sharif (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Vicky Sharareh Sharif: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/29/22. (aje)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Vicky Sharareh Sharif (1) $20,000 PS secured by 2 FRAs(1 related)... Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/29/2022. (cxl)
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Vicky Sharareh Sharif (cxl)
Related: [-]