Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Sara L Ellis
Case #: 1:22-cv-04581
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2022
Terminated:Feb 23, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 25, 2023 3:54 AM CST
Defendant
Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc.
Represented By
Steven Michael Hartmann
Freeborn & Peters
contact info
Erin McAdams Franzblau
Freeborn & Peters LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Ambion
Represented By
Eric Donald Coleman
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
contact info
Nathan Charles Volheim
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
contact info
Chad William Eisenback
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/13/2022 6:41 AM CDT
Monday, August 29, 2022
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, )
Related: [-]
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Superior Air-Ground Ambulance Service, Inc. (smb, )
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19784928 filed by Maria Ambion; Jury Demand.(Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
2 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Maria Ambion by Nathan Charles Volheim (Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Maria Ambion by Chad William Eisenback (Eisenback, Chad)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Maria Ambion by Eric Donald Coleman (Coleman, Eric)
Related: [-]