Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Raymond A Jackson
Referred: Douglas E Miller
Case #: 2:22-cv-00362
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2022
Terminated:Dec 05, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Feb 25, 2023 4:35 AM EST
Defendant
Grant County Mulch, Inc.
Represented By
Lucas I. Pangle
Wharton Aldhizer & Weaver PLC
contact info
Lauren Rachel Darden
Wharton Aldhizer & Weaver, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Erwin Milbourne
Represented By
Steven Blythe Wiley
Wiley Law Offices PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Saturday, December 03, 2022
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Sat 12/03 7:47 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Erwin Milbourne. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
21 21 notice Notice (other) Fri 11/04 11:42 AM
NOTICE by Grant County Mulch, Inc. re10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer ,8 MOTION to Set Aside Default Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument and of Narrowing of Issues Pursuant to Local Rule 7E (Darden, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
utility Motions Referred Fri 10/28 9:24 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Douglas Miller.10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (epri, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/27 6:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION for Extension of Time,10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer ,8 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Grant County Mulch, Inc..(Darden, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit M,
Att: 2 Exhibit N,
Att: 3 Exhibit O
Monday, October 24, 2022
19 19 motion Extension of Time re Transcript Mon 10/24 1:26 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer ,8 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Erwin Milbourne.(Wiley, Steven) Modified event type from memorandum in opposition to a motion on 10/24/2022 (afar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
misc Notice of Correction Mon 10/24 10:23 AM
Notice of Correction re18 Memorandum in Opposition: The document contains more than one pleading (memorandum in opposition and motion for leave) Please refile the document again as a motion for leave for extension of time and attach a proposed order to the motion for consideration of the court. (afar)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
18 18 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Fri 10/21 5:14 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re8 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Erwin Milbourne.(Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/21 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas I. Pangle on behalf of Grant County Mulch, Inc. (Pangle, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
16 16 trial Exhibit Fri 10/07 2:27 PM
EXHIBIT K - Replacement re9 Memorandum in Support,11 Memorandum in Support by Grant County Mulch, Inc...(Darden, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
15 15 trial Exhibit Fri 10/07 2:26 PM
EXHIBIT J - Replacement re9 Memorandum in Support,11 Memorandum in Support by Grant County Mulch, Inc...(Darden, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
14 14 trial Exhibit Fri 10/07 2:23 PM
EXHIBIT B - Replacement re9 Memorandum in Support,11 Memorandum in Support by Grant County Mulch, Inc...(Darden, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
13 13 trial Exhibit Fri 10/07 2:14 PM
EXHIBIT A - Replacement re9 Memorandum in Support,11 Memorandum in Support by Grant County Mulch, Inc...(Darden, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
12 12 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 10/07 12:29 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Grant County Mulch, Inc.. (Darden, Lauren)
Related: [-]
11 11 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 10/07 12:28 PM
Memorandum in Support re10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Grant County Mulch, Inc..(Darden, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/07 12:24 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Grant County Mulch, Inc.. (Darden, Lauren)
Related: [-]
9 9 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 10/07 12:21 PM
Memorandum in Support re8 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Grant County Mulch, Inc..(Darden, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L
8 8 motion Set Aside Default Fri 10/07 12:16 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default by Grant County Mulch, Inc.. (Darden, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
7 7 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 09/29 4:22 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Grant County Mulch, Inc. (epri, )
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 09/29 10:08 AM
Memorandum in Support re5 Request for Entry of Default as to Complaint filed by Erwin Milbourne.(Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
5 5 motion Entry of Default Thu 09/29 10:06 AM
Request for Entry of Default as to Complaint by Erwin Milbourne. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Thu 09/22 11:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on John W. Flora, Reg. Agent on 08/31/22, filed by Erwin Milbourne. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 08/29 3:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Grant County Mulch, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 08/29 2:09 PM
Proposed Summons by Erwin Milbourne. (Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/29 2:04 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8545423.), filed by Erwin Milbourne.(Wiley, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Mon 08/29 3:23 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
Related: [-]