Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-12591
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Feb 18, 2023 7:43 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
JASON HEITMANN
Represented By
ADAM BRYAN WOLFSON
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Etc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 25, 2022
2 2 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number FLN300015601. Fee status updated to paid. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by JASON HEITMANN. (WOLFSON, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet