Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Case #: 1:22-cv-03453
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2022
Terminated:Aug 30, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 21, 2023 3:40 AM EST
Defendant
Brookhaven Storage, LLC
Represented By
Scott Ives Zucker
Weissmann Zucker Euster Morochnik & Garber, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Monica Brown
3495 Buckhead Loop #18785
Atlanta, GA 30326


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
3 3 utility Remark Tue 08/30 3:11 PM
Receipts re Remands to Superior Court of Fulton County for Case No.22CV2427 and 22cv2410 (kxm)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 08/30 2:27 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Monica Brown re2 Order. (kxm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 08/30 2:35 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (kxm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
2 2 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/30 2:25 PM
ORDER: This case comes before the Court on Plaintiff Monica Brown's Notice of Removal. Dkt. No.1 . Because this action was removed by Plaintiff rather than Defendant, it was improperly removed and the Court cannot maintain jurisdiction over it. The cases must be REMANDED to Dekalb County Superior Court. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/29/2022. (kxm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 08/29 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number GAN100140602) filed by Monica Brown.(kxm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service and State Court Filings,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet