Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Scott L Palk
Case #: 5:22-cv-00756
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2022
Terminated:Jun 05, 2023
Case in other court:Lincoln County District Court, CJ-22-00108
Last checked: Saturday Feb 25, 2023 2:30 AM CST
Defendant
Keyera Energy Inc
Represented By
David H Herrold
Burke Bogdanowicz PLLC
contact info
Scott Karl Koelker
Burke Bogdanowicz PLLC
contact info
Whitney Warren
Burke Bogdanowicz PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BB Energy USA Llc
Represented By
Patrick G Colvin
Jones Gotcher & Bogan PC
contact info
Derrick Carson
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
C Michael Copeland
Jones Gotcher & Bogan PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, June 05, 2023
32 32 13 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Mon 06/05 3:50 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Remand to State Court as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 6/5/23. (ms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
31 31 respm Response to Non - Motion Thu 05/18 9:43 AM
RESPONSE re30 Status Report and Clarification filed by Keyera Energy Inc. (Herrold, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
30 30 misc Status Report Tue 05/16 12:15 PM
STATUS REPORT and Request for Hearing on Motion to Remand by Plaintiff BB Energy USA Llc. (Copeland, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
29 29 notice ~Notice (other) Thu 12/15 3:27 PM
NOTICE (other) by Keyera Energy Inc REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FURTHER BRIEFING AND SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN RELATED CASE (Koelker, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
28 28 respm Reply Wed 10/19 6:09 PM
REPLY by Plaintiff BB Energy USA Llc re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court / BB Energy USA LLC's REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMIND filed by BB Energy USA Llc.(Carson, Derrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, October 13, 2022
27 27 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 10/13 12:28 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Whitney Warren on behalf of Keyera Energy Inc (Warren, Whitney)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 10/13 12:26 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Scott Karl Koelker on behalf of Keyera Energy Inc (Koelker, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/12 3:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Keyera Energy Inc.(Herrold, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Mark Wright),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Storage Agreement - PetroLama 5 14-2018 ,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (Storage Agreement - PetroLama 5 15-2018 ,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (Management Services Agreement),
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 (Ltr - Termination Notice)
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/11 2:23 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott E. Koelker; granting23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Whitney L. Warren. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 10/11/22. (ms)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Tue 10/11 12:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Whitney L. Warren, as counsel for Defendant Keyera Energy Inc. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-4009438 by Keyera Energy Inc.(Herrold, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Request for Admission - Warren)
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Tue 10/11 12:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Scott K. Koelker, as counsel for Defendant Keyera Energy Inc. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-4009432 by Keyera Energy Inc.(Herrold, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Request for Admission - Koelker)
Monday, October 03, 2022
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 10/03 11:01 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) (as corrected per Notice from the Court dated Oct. 3, 2022) filed by Keyera Energy Inc.(Herrold, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (PetroLama Supply Agreement - May 14, 2018),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (PetroLama Supply Agreement - May 15, 2018)
notice Notice from the Court Mon 10/03 10:42 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT 20 Reply to Response to Motion is STRICKEN due to Counsel's failure to comply with ECF Policies & Procedures Manual, Section II.A.4.a. Counsel is directed to refile this document in compliance with the Rules and Procedures. (ms)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 09/30 3:17 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Keyera Energy Inc.(Herrold, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Friday, September 23, 2022
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/23 4:47 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by BB Energy USA Llc.(Colvin, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Original Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit Complaint
Thursday, September 22, 2022
18 18 misc Disclosure Statement - LLC Thu 09/22 8:31 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by BB Energy USA Llc . (Colvin, Patrick)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Remand to State Court Thu 09/22 8:24 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by BB Energy USA Llc.(Colvin, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit SDTX Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Vitor Bruno,
Att: 4 Exhibit BB Energy Trading Ltd Company Information,
Att: 5 Exhibit Business Organizations Inquiry,
Att: 6 Exhibit Delaware Annual FranchiseTax Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit Oklahoma Filing Details,
Att: 8 Exhibit Notice of 2022 Annual Meeting of Shareholders,
Att: 9 Exhibit Keyera Annual Information Form
16 16 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 09/22 4:46 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Derrick Carson on behalf of BB Energy USA Llc (Carson, Derrick)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice ~Notice (other) Thu 09/22 2:54 PM
STRICKEN - Pursuant to Notice from the Court - NOTICE (other) by BB Energy USA Llc of Appearance of Kurt Lance Krolikowski (Copeland, C) Modified on 9/22/2022 (ms)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice ~Notice (other) Thu 09/22 2:52 PM
STRICKEN - Pursuant to Notice from the Court - NOTICE (other) by BB Energy USA Llc of Appearance of Derrick B. Carson (Copeland, C) Modified on 9/22/2022 (ms)
Related: [-]
notice Notice from the Court Thu 09/22 3:03 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT 15 Notice (other),14 Notice (other) are STRICKEN due to Counsel's failure to comply with LCvR 83.4. (ms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/20 11:08 AM
ORDER - within seven days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file its disclosure statement in accordance with LCvR 7.1.1. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 9/20/22. (ms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
12 12 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 09/06 5:09 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by C Michael Copeland on behalf of BB Energy USA Llc (Copeland, C)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 09/06 5:07 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick G Colvin on behalf of BB Energy USA Llc (Colvin, Patrick)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/06 9:40 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Derrick B. Carson; granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kurt L. Krolikowski. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 9/6/22. (ms)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
9 9 motion Dismiss Fri 09/02 8:48 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Keyera Energy Inc.(Herrold, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Agreement)
Thursday, September 01, 2022
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Thu 09/01 1:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kurt L. Krolikowski Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3983613 by BB Energy USA Llc.(Colvin, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Kurt L. Krolikowski
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Thu 09/01 1:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Derrick B. Carson Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3983598 by BB Energy USA Llc.(Colvin, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Derrick B. Carson
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Tue 08/30 1:55 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Relief from Local Rule 83.3(a) Requirements. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 8/30/22. (ms)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs motion Order Tue 08/30 9:18 AM
MOTION for Order Granting Relief from LCvR 83.3(a) Requirements by Keyera Energy Inc.(Herrold, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Crombie Order)
4 4 notice Notice of Related or Companion Case Tue 08/30 9:13 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by Keyera Energy Inc (Herrold, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 08/30 9:12 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by David H Herrold on behalf of Keyera Energy Inc (Herrold, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Tue 08/30 9:10 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Keyera Energy Inc . (Herrold, David)
Related: [-]
misc Payment for a Civil Case Tue 08/30 9:08 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE (BB Energy v. Keyera Energy) Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3981204. (Herrold, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 08/30 8:40 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lincoln County District Court, case number CJ-2022-108 filed by Keyera Energy Inc.(rr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Summons (issued),
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Appearance,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Motion for TRO - combined,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Court Minute Order,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet