Original Case: 2:21-cv-00189

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-08059
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2022
Terminated:Jun 23, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 27, 2023 2:32 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
ACUITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Eric Duncan Hevenor
Lambdin & Chaney
contact info
Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Lambdin & Chaney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
199 EAST PEARL CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Eric E. Torgersen
Holley, Albertson, & Polk
contact info
Melissa R. Liff
Holley, Albertson & Polk
contact info
Dennis B. Polk
Holley, Albertson & Polk
contact info
Scott David Albertson
Holley, Albertson, & Polk
contact info

GPO Jun 23 2023
[11008102] Affirmed; Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing; Written, signed, unpublished. Judges Tymkovich, Baldock and McHugh (authoring). Mandate to issue. [22-8059]

Docket last updated: 06/27/2023 2:32 AM MDT
Friday, August 26, 2022
[10936473] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/26/2022 Docketing statement due 09/09/2022 for 199 East Pearl Condominium Owners Association. Fee due on 09/09/2022 for 199 East Pearl Condominium Owners Association. Transcript order form due 09/09/2022 for 199 East Pearl Condominium Owners Association. Notice of appearance due on 09/09/2022 for 199 East Pearl Condominium Owners Association and Acuity Insurance Company. 22-8059
Related: [-]
Att: 1 46 pgs Prelim ROA
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil