Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:22-cv-01148
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2022
Terminated:Sep 29, 2022
Last checked: Monday Feb 27, 2023 4:30 AM EST
Defendant
PACCAR Inc.
Plaintiff
Aperture Net LLC
Represented By
Jimmy C. Chong
The Chong Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, September 29, 2022
9 9 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Thu 09/29 12:21 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,711,204.(nms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 09/29 11:52 AM
SO ORDERED Granting7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/29/2022. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/28 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aperture Net LLC as to PACCAR Inc. (Chong, Jimmy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/14 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aperture Net LLC.PACCAR Inc. served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (Chong, Jimmy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/07 12:38 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01147-RGA through 1:22-cv-01151-RGA, and 1:22-cv-01159-RGA (rjb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued - Electronic Service Wed 08/31 4:51 PM
Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Wed 08/31 4:51 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Aperture Net LLC. (apk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Wed 08/31 4:50 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,711,204. (apk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Wed 08/31 4:50 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 08/31 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against PACCAR Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3949016.) - filed by Aperture Net LLC.(apk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 List of Related Cases,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet