Feindt v. United States of America
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie E Kobayashi |
Referred: | Kenneth J Mansfield |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00397 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 26, 2023 11:12 PM HST |
Defendant
United States of America, The
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kandyce Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Maben
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isabel Maloon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian McClanahan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine McClanahan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William McClanahan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Mello
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Belinda Miles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hailey Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aitbeth Mudcha
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Overbaugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Audrey Lamagna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harry Pulou
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorelei Pulou
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lacey Quintero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Staple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Traina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Watson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paige Wheeler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindsey Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Witt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Zawieruszynski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Kirkpatrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Feindt, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane and John Does 1000
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Simic
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ariana Wyatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbie Arnold
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crystal Arnold
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Aubart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Saori Aubart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AnnMarie Boggs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrianna Coberley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richelle Dietz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Flewellen-Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nastasia Freeman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anayansi Fritz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Fritz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adriana Grow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Grow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsa Guerra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheena Jessup
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Maben
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM HST |
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
621 | 621
![]() PRELIMINARY FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 5/7/2025. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00397-LEK-KJM, 1:23-cv-00457-LEK-KJM, 1:24-cv-00059-LEK-KJM (eta) |