Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Brantley Starr
Referred: Rebecca Rutherford
Case #: 3:22-cv-01935
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2022
Last checked: Monday Feb 27, 2023 3:01 AM CST
Defendant
Carlos Cruz
Represented By
Jeffrey M Tillotson
Tillotson Law
contact info
Benjamin L Nabors
Tillotson Law
contact info
Defendant
MagicStar Arrow Entertainment LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey M Tillotson
Tillotson Law
contact info
Benjamin L Nabors
Tillotson Law
contact info
Defendant
MagicStar Arrow Inc
Represented By
Jeffrey M Tillotson
Tillotson Law
contact info
Benjamin L Nabors
Tillotson Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly M Crawford
in his capacity as Receiver Scheef & Stone LLP 500 N Akard St Suite 2700
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Cort Thomas
Brown Fox PLLC
contact info
Charlene Cantrell Koonce
Brown Fox PLLC
contact info
Peter C Lewis
Scheef & Stone LLP
contact info
Kelly M Crawford
Scheef & Stone LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 22 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART the motion to dismiss. The Court GRANTS the motion as to the Receiver's constructive fraudulent transfer claim for all transfers made before 1/24/2018 and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE those claims. The Court DENIES the motion as to all the Receiver's remaining claims. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/22/2023) (twd)
GPO Dec 14 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 37 Motion to Strike. Defendants' first, second, fourth, fifth, sixth, eighth, ninth, tenth, eleventh, twelfth, and thirteenth affirmative defenses are STRUCK. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/14/2023) (axm)

Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
78 78 misc Status Report Mon 04/28 4:58 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Post-Mediation filed by Kelly M Crawford. (Lewis, Peter)
Related: [-]