New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Roslynn R Mauskopf
Referred: Vera M Scanlon
Case #: 1:14-cv-05368
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2014
Terminated:Jul 01, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday May 13, 2015 6:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Anthony Mallilo
Represented By
Salvatore G Gangemi
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLP
contact info
Defendant
Georgia Mallilo
Represented By
Salvatore G Gangemi
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mallilo & Grossman
Represented By
Salvatore G Gangemi
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Miriam Andino
Represented By
Neil Frank
Frank & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Peter Arcadio Romero
Frank & Associates P.C.
contact info
Denise Ivette Cortes
Frank & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
16 16 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/01 12:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Anthony Mallilo, Georgia Mallilo, Mallilo & Grossman (Gangemi, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
15 15 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 06/30 1:28 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Miriam Andino. (Romero, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Status Report Order Tue 06/23 5:15 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Adjourn Conference; STATUS REPORT ORDER: At14 , the Parties that this matter has settled. On or before 7/22/2015, the Parties will file their stipulation of dismissal or a proposed revised discovery schedule. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/23/2015. (Rice, Liane)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2015
14 14 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 06/22 5:38 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Anthony Mallilo, Georgia Mallilo, Mallilo & Grossman. (Gangemi, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/12 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Frank on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Frank, Neil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2015
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/16 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Ivette Cortes on behalf of Miriam Andino (aty to be noticed) (Cortes, Denise)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2015
11 11 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/04 7:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Having conferred with counsel and/or the parties (see separate minute entry for appearances), and as set forth in detail in the attached Order, the Court orders the discovery schedule. Please particularly note the following dates and other items: On or before 6/18/2015, the parties must file a joint status letter of no more than 3 pages describing the status of discovery and any outstanding discovery disputes. Telephone Conference set for 6/25/2015 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Plaintiff's counsel is to initiate a conference call with counsel then call Chambers at (718) 613-2300 at the designated time. On or before 11/16/2015, the parties must file on ECF a joint letter confirming that discovery is concluded. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/2/2015. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Wed 03/04 7:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 3/2/2015. Please see attached for appearances. (Tape #4:51-5:17.) (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 05, 2015
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 02/05 4:07 PM
Scheduling Order: Set/Reset Hearings: The 3/2/2015 Initial Conference is moved to a later time that same date due to a scheduling conflict. Initial Conference reset for 3/2/2015 04:45 PM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 04, 2015
9 9 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/04 3:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/2/2015 04:15 PM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties must review the attached initial conference order and complete the proposed initial scheduling order before coming to the initial conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/4/2015. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 20, 2014
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/20 2:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallilo & Grossman (Gangemi, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/20 2:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Gangemi, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 12, 2014
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint on or before 11/24/2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/12/2014. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 10, 2014
6 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Anthony Mallilo, Georgia Mallilo, Mallilo & Grossman. (Gangemi, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 14, 2014
ORDER granting5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer On or before 11/10/2014, all Defendants will answer or otherwise respond. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/14/2014. (Lozar, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 10, 2014
5 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Anthony Mallilo, Georgia Mallilo, Mallilo & Grossman. (Gangemi, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 26, 2014
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miriam Andino. Anthony Mallilo served on 9/25/2014, answer due 10/16/2014; Georgia Mallilo served on 9/25/2014, answer due 10/16/2014; Mallilo & Grossman served on 9/25/2014, answer due 10/16/2014. (Romero, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 16, 2014
3 3 Summons Issued as to Anthony Mallilo, Georgia Mallilo, Mallilo & Grossman. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
2 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. The following corrections were made: None. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 12, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Mallilo, Georgia Mallilo, Mallilo & Grossman filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7194602 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Miriam Andino. (Romero, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Anthony Mallilo,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Georgia Mallilo,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Mallillo & Grossman