Original Case: 1:20-cv-03333

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-prici-10769
Typeprivate civil / diversity
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2022
Terminated:Aug 23, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Sep 01, 2022 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
ALLSTATE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Marvin D. Dikeman
Webb Zschunke Neary & Dikeman, LLP
contact info
Melissa Cordell McMullen
Webb Zschunke Neary & Dikeman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRIAN FINNERAN
Represented By
Michael B. Weinstein
Weinstein & Black, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ERIN FINNERAN
Represented By
Michael B. Weinstein
Weinstein & Black, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/01/2022 4:31 AM EDT
Thursday, March 03, 2022
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Brian Finneran and Erin Finneran on 03/02/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/12/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/28/2022 as to Appellant Brian Finneran. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/11/2022 as to Appellee Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties
Att: 2 3 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 1 pgs USDC Judgment DE 41
Att: 4 15 pgs USDC Order DE 40