Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-17252
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2022
Terminated:Mar 08, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 02, 2023 6:57 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
ELRA T HARRISON
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/08 1:56 PM
ORDER - The motions identified on Exhibit A are GRANTED. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with the Courts Order, ECF No. 3655. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/8/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/01 3:23 PM
ORDER - Despite the Court's warnings, the 609 plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B have more than one case filed on the active docket. The law firms representing these plaintiffs are directed to confer with one another and move to dismiss the case that is deemed to be the duplicate case within 21 days of the date of this Order. To the extent the law firms fail to dismiss the duplicate case by the deadline, the Court will dismiss the later filed case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/1/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, September 01, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 09/01 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - Pennsylvania Western by ELRA T HARRISON (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/01 3:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/01 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7424874.), filed by ELRA T HARRISON. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]