Minnesota District Court
Judge:Eric C Tostrud
Referred: Tony N Leung
Case #: 0:22-cv-02152
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12112 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2022
Terminated:Nov 17, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Mar 02, 2023 6:46 AM CST
Defendant
Nelson Numeric, LLC
a foreign Limited Liability Company 805 Pierce Street
Waterloo, WI 53594
Plaintiff
Dawn Acker
2900 Overlook Drive
Bloomington, MN 55431
Represented By
Stephen C Fiebiger
Stephen C. Fiebiger Law Office, Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/16 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dawn Acker (Fiebiger, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 09/02 9:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Nelson Numeric, LLC. (ACH)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/02 9:09 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint filed by Nelson Numeric, LLC filed by Dawn Acker. (Fiebiger, Stephen)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Fri 09/02 9:26 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-2152 ECT/TNL. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/01 4:30 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9737226) filed by Dawn Acker. Filer requests summons issued. (Fiebiger, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet