Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Vanessa D Gilmore
Case #: 4:12-cv-03572
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2012
Terminated:Jul 24, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Mar 12, 2015 12:18 AM CDT
Conflict Check Party
General Electric Company
Counter Claimant
East Crockett Medical Building Corp
Represented By
Robert Chamless Lane
Lane Law Firm
contact info
Shane A McClelland
Simon Herbert Et Al
contact info
Intervenor
East Crockett Medical Building Corp
East Crockett Medical Building Corp 203 North College Street
Cleveland, TX 77327
Represented By
Robert Chamless Lane
Lane Law Firm
contact info
Shane A McClelland
Simon Herbert Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
General Electric Credit Equities, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Daniel Morfey
Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Claimant
Epione Health Group PLLC
Terminated: 12/09/2013
Represented By
Nelson M Jones, III
Law Office Of Nelson M. Jones Iii
contact info
Dean W Ferguson
contact info
Counter Claimant
Samir I Kreit
Terminated: 12/09/2013
Represented By
Nelson M Jones, III
Law Office Of Nelson M. Jones Iii
contact info
Dean W Ferguson
contact info
Counter Defendant
General Electric Capital Corporation
Terminated: 12/09/2013
Represented By
Michael Daniel Morfey
Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
General Electric Credit Equities, Inc.
Terminated: 05/23/2014
Represented By
Michael Daniel Morfey
Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
East Crockett Medical Building Corp
Terminated: 05/23/2014
Represented By
Robert Chamless Lane
Lane Law Firm
contact info
Shane A McClelland
Simon Herbert Et Al
contact info
Cross Claimant
Epione Health Group PLLC
Terminated: 07/24/2014
Represented By
Nelson M Jones, III
Law Office Of Nelson M. Jones Iii
contact info
Cross Claimant
Samir I Kreit
Terminated: 07/24/2014
Represented By
Nelson M Jones, III
Law Office Of Nelson M. Jones Iii
contact info
Cross Defendant
Mark Kreit
Terminated: 07/23/2014
Represented By
Justin Ryan Goodman
Lubel Voyles LLP
contact info
Defendant
Epione Health Group PLLC
Terminated: 07/24/2014
Represented By
Nelson M Jones, III
Law Office Of Nelson M. Jones Iii
contact info
Dean W Ferguson
contact info
Defendant
Mark Kreit
Terminated: 07/23/2014
Represented By
Justin Ryan Goodman
Lubel Voyles LLP
contact info
Defendant
Samir I Kreit
Terminated: 07/24/2014
203 N. College St PO Box 1816
Cleveland, TX 77327
Represented By
Nelson M Jones, III
Law Office Of Nelson M. Jones Iii
contact info
Dean W Ferguson
contact info



Create an account to get the full docket for this case.