ZANETICH v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Christine P O'Hearn |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Pascal |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05387 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of Nj Gloucster Cty., GLO-L-000605-22 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 02, 2023 6:48 AM EST |
Defendant
WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SAM'S EAST, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ERICK ZANETICH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, January 23, 2025 | ||
appeal
Mandate Notice
Thu 01/23 10:27 AM
Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 1/21/2025. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (mag) |
||
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() MANDATE of USCA as to18 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by ERICK ZANETICH (Finance notified).(ca3cjg) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, December 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() USCA JUDGMENT as to18 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by ERICK ZANETICH affirming the decision of the District Court. (ca3cjg) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() USCA Case Number 23-1996 for18 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by ERICK ZANETICH. USCA Case Manager Caitlyn (CJG) (Document Restricted - Court Only). (ca3cjg) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL as to17 Order on Motion to Dismiss,16 Opinion by ERICK ZANETICH. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANJDC-14352519. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 6/6/2023. (SWIDLER, JUSTIN) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER granting Defendants'10 Motion to Dismiss in its entirety. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 5/24/2023. (dmr) |
|
16 | 16
![]() OPINION. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 5/24/2023. (dmr) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SAM'S EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. re10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (DIAMOND, TRACEY) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA S. BOYETTE on behalf of ERICK ZANETICH (BOYETTE, JOSHUA) |
|
13 | 13
![]() BRIEF in Opposition filed by ERICK ZANETICH re10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (BOYETTE, JOSHUA) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2022 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 10/17 10:49 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Motion set for 11/21/2022 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) |
||
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (SWIDLER, JUSTIN) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Letter from Leigh H. McMonigle re10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (MCMONIGLE, LEIGH) |
|
Sunday, October 09, 2022 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Sun 10/09 9:17 AM
Set Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Motion set for 11/7/2022 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) |
||
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by SAM'S EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC..(DIAMOND, TRACEY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certification on behalf of SAM'S EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC.. (MCMONIGLE, LEIGH) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' response deadline to the Complaint is extended to 10/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 9/19/2022. (dmr) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Letter from Leigh H. McMonigle.(MCMONIGLE, LEIGH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 08, 2022 | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Thu 09/08 9:52 AM
Clerk's Text Order - The document6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SAM'S EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/23/2022. (dmr) |
||
Wednesday, September 07, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint.. (MCMONIGLE, LEIGH) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2022 | ||
qc
QC - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 09/06 12:53 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jab) |
||
order
Order re Diversity of Citizenship
Tue 09/06 12:55 PM
Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties,[LINK:click here] , within 30 days of the filing of a Notice of Removal, or where the Complaint is initially filed in this Court, 30 days after an answer, other responsive pleading, or motion has been filed. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 9/6/2022. (jab) |
||
Friday, September 02, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by LEIGH MCMONIGLE on behalf of SAM'S EAST,INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. (MCMONIGLE, LEIGH) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. MORAN on behalf of SAM'S EAST,INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. (MORAN, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAM'S EAST,INC. identifying Walmart Inc.,Sams West, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DIAMOND, TRACEY) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. identifying Walmart Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DIAMOND, TRACEY) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SAM'S EAST,INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Gloucester County, case number GLO-L-000605-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13668384), filed by SAM'S EAST,INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC..(DIAMOND, TRACEY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 09/02 4:48 PM
Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (mmb, ) |