Scott Freeman, M.D., v. Stephen Hurst, et al.
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Maximiliano D Couvillier |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-01433 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Racketeering (RICO) |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Eighth Judicial District Court, District of Nevada, A22-855842B |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 02, 2023 3:55 AM PST |
Counter Claimant
Stephen Hurst
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Scott Freeman, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Russell Burbank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ceruvia Lifesciences
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nico Forte
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephen Hurst
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sunray Asset Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carey Turnbull
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BPM LLP
|
Represented By
|
Nominal Defendant
Savant Addiction Medicine, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Nominal Defendant
Savant HWP Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Nominal Defendant
Savant HWP, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Freeman, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
288 | 288
![]() ORDER Granting287 Stipulated Protective Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 4/25/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JG) |
|
287 | 287
![]() STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiff Scott Freeman, M.D.. (Smith, Abraham) |
|
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
286 | 286
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable re281 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney addressed to David S. Kupetz. RTS, unable to forward. (AMMi) |
|
285 | 285
![]() ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the284 stipulated protective order is denied without prejudice. Any disputes regarding confidentiality or the protective order must be resolved pursuant to the Court's 212 Standing Order. The proposed stipulation also fails to comply with LR IA 6-2, which requires the judicial signature block to appear on the same page as the last substantive matter. The parties may submit an amended stipulation in compliance with LR IA 6-2 and amending paragraph 35 to so that the dispute resolution procedures comply with the Court's Standing Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 4/21/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) |