Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 3:22-cr-00008
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Sep 03, 2022 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
India Middleton (1)
Represented By
Leigh Ann Webster
Strickland Webster, Llc -Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Miguel R. Acosta
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/03/2022 4:08 AM EDT
Thursday, August 04, 2022
1 1 INFORMATION with FORFEITURE PROVISION as to India Middleton (1) count(s) 1. (bgt)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr.: INITIAL APPEARANCE, ARRAIGNMENT, and CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING held as to India Middleton. PLEA of GUILTY by India Middleton (1) as to Count 1 of the Criminal Information. (Court Reporter Geraldine Glover) (bgt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 22 pgs Guilty Plea and Plea Agreement
3 3 NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to India Middleton. Sentencing is set for 11/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in NEWN 3rd Floor Courtroom before Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (bgt)
Related: [-]