Member Case
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-68113

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barbara Ellis-Monro
Case #: 1:14-bk-68111
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Oct 22, 2014
Terminated:Feb 28, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Johnson Industries, Inc.
5944 Peachtree Cors E
Norcross, GA 30071-1336
Represented By
Ashley Reynolds Ray
Scroggins & Williamson
contact info
J. Robert Williamson
Scroggins And Williamson
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Building 75 Spring Street, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303
Represented By
Vivieon E. Kelley
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Thursday, February 28, 2019
misc 06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Discharge not applicable Thu 02/28 10:21 AM
Case Closed. (cws)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 01, 2018
20 20 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Case Reassignment Notice (301,302) Mon 04/02 3:48 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Case Reassignment Notice. Notice Date 04/01/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 30, 2018
19 19 misc Notice of Case Reassignment Fri 03/30 3:51 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from the Honorable Mary Grace Diehl to the Honorable Barbara Ellis-Monro. Service by BNC (rf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/20 10:36 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc. (Becket & Lee, LLP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 09, 2014
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/09 9:12 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Gilbert B. Weisman on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc. (Weisman, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 28, 2014
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/29 7:57 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by ExxonMobil . (cws)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 03, 2014
15 15 2 pgs misc P-Attorney Disclosure Statement Fri 10/03 4:31 PM
Equity Security Holders , Attorney Disclosure Statement filed by J. Robert Williamson on behalf of Johnson Industries, Inc.. (Williamson, J.)
Related: [-]
14 14 66 pgs misc P-Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules Fri 10/03 11:40 AM
Schedule A , Schedule B , Schedule D , Schedule E , Schedule F , Schedule G , Schedule H , Summary of Schedules , Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules filed by Ashley Reynolds Ray on behalf of Johnson Industries, Inc.. (Ray, Ashley)
Related: [-]
13 13 43 pgs misc P - Statement of Financial Affairs Fri 10/03 11:37 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Ashley Reynolds Ray on behalf of Johnson Industries, Inc.. (Ray, Ashley)
Related: [-]
12 12 6 pgs notice Notice Fri 10/03 11:35 AM
Notice of Global Notes to Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs Filed by Ashley Reynolds Ray on behalf of Johnson Industries, Inc.. (Ray, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 24, 2014
11 11 misc 03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11) Wed 09/24 8:11 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11). 341 Meeting to be held on 10/22/2014 at 11:00 AM in Hearing Room 365, Atlanta. (cws)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 22, 2014
10 10 3 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/23 8:07 AM
Notice of Appearance and request for notices Filed by Douglas C. Bernstein on behalf of Denso Products and Services Americas, Inc. . (cws)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 20, 2014
9 9 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Joint Administration Sun 09/21 1:54 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Joint Administration Notice Date 09/20/2014. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 18, 2014
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Deficiency Fri 09/19 1:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Deficiency Notice Date 09/18/2014. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Letter Thu 09/18 10:31 AM
An order has been entered in this case jointly administering this case with the bankruptcy case of Miller Auto Parts & Supply Company, Inc., Case No. 14-68113 mgd, for procedural purposes only. The docket in Case No. 14-68113 mgd should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (cws)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Joint Administration, Motion for Thu 09/18 10:28 AM
Order GRANTING Motion for Joint Administration Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 9/18/2014. (cws)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, September 16, 2014
5 5 notice Notice of Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency
Notice of deadlines to correct filing deficiencies. Service by BNC. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/29/2014. Schedule(s) due by 9/29/2014, Declaration re: debtors schedules due by 9/29/2014, Summary of Schedules due 9/29/2014.Statistical Summary due 9/29/2014. Atty Disclosure State. due 9/29/2014. List of Equity Security Holders due 9/29/2014. (cws)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/16 11:40 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Vivieon E. Kelley on behalf of Office of the United States Trustee. (Kelley, Vivieon)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 15, 2014
3 3 motion Joint Administration, Motion for Mon 09/15 5:47 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Ashley Reynolds Ray on behalf of Johnson Industries, Inc.. (Ray, Ashley)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Mon 09/15 4:19 PM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-68111 [misc,4002aty] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 36439741. Fee Amount 1717.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 130 pgs misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 09/15 4:17 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fee $ 1717, Filed by J. Robert Williamson of Scroggins and Williamson on behalf of Johnson Industries, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan due by 1/13/2015. Disclosure Statement due by 1/13/2015. (Williamson, J.)
Related: [-]