California Eastern District Court
Judge:Morrison C England, Jr
Referred: Carolyn K Delaney
Case #: 2:22-cv-01555
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2022
Terminated:Mar 29, 2023
Case in other court:Sacramento County Superior Court, 34-02022-00324483
Last checked: Sunday Mar 05, 2023 1:48 AM PST
Defendant
Ahead, Inc.
Represented By
Ryan Lee Eddings
Littler Mendelson (fresno)
contact info
Plaintiff
Koop Ferwerda
Represented By
Shahla Judith Jalil-Valles
Jml Law, Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/29 12:50 PM
CASE CLOSED: pursuant to10 Joint Notice of Settlement. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 03/28 2:37 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT (Joint) of Entire Action and Request For Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by Ahead, Inc.. Attorney Gascon, Jemuel added. Dispositional Docs due by 4/21/2023. (Gascon, Jemuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
9 9 misc Jury Demand Tue 09/20 12:13 PM
DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Koop Ferwerda. (Jalil-Valles, Shahla)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Interested Parties Tue 09/20 12:11 PM
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Koop Ferwerda. (Jalil-Valles, Shahla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
7 7 misc Civil New Case Documents for MCE Tue 09/06 12:21 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
6 6 service Certificate / Proof of Service Tue 09/06 9:36 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Ahead, Inc., re5 Declaration,3 Corporate Disclosure Statement,4 Declaration,2 Civil Cover Sheet,1 Notice of Removal. (Eddings, Ryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Declaration Tue 09/06 9:32 AM
DECLARATION of Andrew Szafran re1 Notice of Removal. (Eddings, Ryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Tue 09/06 9:31 AM
DECLARATION of Ryan L. Eddings re1 Notice of Removal. (Eddings, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/06 9:29 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Ahead, Inc. (Eddings, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/06 9:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ahead, Inc., (Eddings, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 52 pgs notice Notice of Removal Tue 09/06 9:05 AM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2022 00324483 by Ahead, Inc., ada Kovarus, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10422643) (Eddings, Ryan)
Related: [-]