South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Referred: Kevin Mcdonald
Case #: 7:22-cv-02977
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12117 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2022
Terminated:Jun 05, 2023
Case in other court:Cherokee County Court of Common Pleas, 22CP110499
Last checked: Sunday Mar 05, 2023 4:41 AM EST
Defendant
Blacksburg Middle School
Represented By
Andrea E White
White And Story LLC
contact info
Joseph Alexander Sherard
White And Story LLC
contact info
Defendant
Carl Carpenter
Represented By
Andrea E White
White And Story LLC
contact info
Joseph Alexander Sherard
White And Story LLC
contact info
Defendant
Cherokee County School District
Represented By
Andrea E White
White And Story LLC
contact info
Joseph Alexander Sherard
White And Story LLC
contact info
Defendant
Cherokee County School District Board of Trustees
Represented By
Andrea E White
White And Story LLC
contact info
Joseph Alexander Sherard
White And Story LLC
contact info
Defendant
Cherokee County School District Office of Superintendent
Represented By
Andrea E White
White And Story LLC
contact info
Joseph Alexander Sherard
White And Story LLC
contact info
Defendant
Dana Fall
Represented By
Andrea E White
White And Story LLC
contact info
Joseph Alexander Sherard
White And Story LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
minor c/o Amanda Bostedo 369 Sherrill Drive
Blacksburg, SC 29702


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, June 05, 2023
39 39 misc Judgment Mon 06/05 10:47 AM
JUDGMENT: This action is DISMISSED without prejudice and without further leave to amend. (alew, )
Related: [-]
38 38 2 pgs order Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation Mon 06/05 10:31 AM
ORDER adopting 34 Report and Recommendation. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice and without further leave to amend. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/5/23. (alew, )
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Mon 06/05 10:48 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED38 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation,39 Judgment placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jane Doe c/o Amanda Bostedo 369 Sherrill Drive Blacksburg, SC 29702 (alew, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
34 34 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 01/11 2:58 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Cherokee County School District Office of Superintendent, Cherokee County School District Board of Trustees, Cherokee County School District, Carl Carpenter, Dana Fall, Blacksburg Middle School. It is recommended that the district court dismiss this action without prejudice, without further leave to amend, and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/11/2023. (kric, )
Related: [-]
misc Transfer of Case Management Wed 01/11 3:00 PM
***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Donald C Coggins, Jr.. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: US District Court, 250 East North Street, Room 2300, Greenville, SC 29601. (kric, )
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Wed 01/11 3:01 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED 35 Transfer of Case Management,34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Notice of Removal placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jane Doe c/o Amanda Bostedo 369 Sherrill Drive Blacksburg, SC 29702 (kric, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/31 2:58 PM
TEXT ORDER denying with leave to refile 23 Ms. Bostedo's motion to redact previously filed documents. Ms. Bostedo has not identified what documents or identifying information she seeks to have redacted. As such, her motion is denied with leave to refile. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/31/2022.(kric, )
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 10/31 3:00 PM
TEXT ORDER granting in part 28 motion to stay. On October 14, 2022, Ms. Bostedo filed a motion to stay seeking additional time to hire an attorney for Jane Doe (doc. 28). Ms. Bostedo's motion is granted in part, and she has until December 29, 2022, to find counsel licensed in this court to represent Jane Doe. No further extensions of time will be granted. If no attorney files a notice of appearance in this case by the above deadline, this case will be forwarded to the assigned United States District Judge with a recommendation that it be dismissed. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/31/2022.(kric, )
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Mon 10/31 3:01 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED 31 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 32 Order on Motion to Stay, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jane Doe c/o Amanda Bostedo 369 Sherrill Drive Blacksburg, SC 29702 (kric, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
29 29 misc Deficiency Memo Mon 10/17 11:46 AM
Deficiency Memo Medical Results See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. (kric, )
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Mon 10/17 11:48 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED29 Deficiency Memo placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jane Doe c/o Amanda Bostedo 369 Sherrill Drive Blacksburg, SC 29702 with medical results (kric, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
28 28 motion Stay Mon 10/17 11:05 AM
MOTION to Stay the case by Jane Doe. Response to Motion due by 10/28/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, September 29, 2022
25 25 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 09/29 12:16 PM
ORDER denying 22 Motion to Amend the complaint. Plaintiff has 10 days from the date of this order to find counsel licensed in this court to represent Jane Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 9/29/2022.(kric, )
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Thu 09/29 12:18 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED25 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jane Doe c/o Amanda Bostedo 369 Sherrill Drive Blacksburg, SC 29702 (kric, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
24 24 misc Deficiency Memo Wed 09/28 1:23 PM
Deficiency Memo regarding Confidential Reference List. See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 10/10/2022. (kric, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 enclosures regarding minor an sealed filings
Friday, September 23, 2022
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/26 3:06 PM
MOTION to redact previously filed documents by Jane Doe. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Amend/Correct Mon 09/26 2:08 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 State Court Documents, complaint, Notice of Removal, by Jane Doe. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed amended complaint
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 09/20 8:08 AM
ORDER denying 18 Motion to Amend the complaint with leave to refile. The defendants are informed that no answers or responsive pleadings are due at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 9/20/2022.(kric, )
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Tue 09/20 8:15 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED20 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jane Doe c/o Amanda Bostedo 369 Sherrill Drive Blacksburg, SC 29702 (kric, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
19 19 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 09/19 11:28 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jane Doe.(kric, ) Modified on 9/19/2022 to edit filing date (kric, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
18 18 motion Amend/Correct Fri 09/16 2:14 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Notice of Removal,, by Jane Doe. Response to Motion due by 9/30/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(rweb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support,
Att: 2 Envelope
Thursday, September 15, 2022
17 17 service Certificate of Service Thu 09/15 1:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blacksburg Middle School, Carl Carpenter, Cherokee County School District, Cherokee County School District Board of Trustees, Cherokee County School District Office of Superintendent, Dana Fall re1 Notice of Removal,, (1.1) Redacted Exhibit A, (1.2) Exhibit B, (1.3) Exhibit C(Sherard, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Certified Mail Receipt confirming service to Plaintiff
16 16 service Certificate of Service Thu 09/15 1:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blacksburg Middle School, Carl Carpenter, Cherokee County School District, Cherokee County School District Board of Trustees, Cherokee County School District Office of Superintendent, Dana Fall re1 Notice of Removal,,(Sherard, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Certified Mail Receipt confirming service to Plaintiff
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
15 15 service Certificate of Service Wed 09/14 12:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blacksburg Middle School, Carl Carpenter, Cherokee County School District, Cherokee County School District Board of Trustees, Cherokee County School District Office of Superintendent, Dana Fall re14 Letter(Sherard, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Letter A. Bostedo regarding Service of ECF No. 14-Letter Extending Answer Deadline
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
14 14 misc Letter Extending Time to Answer Tue 09/13 7:18 PM
LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER All Defendants. (Sherard, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
12 12 order Proper Form Order Wed 09/07 3:02 PM
PRO SE ORDER regarding address, retaining counsel and LR26.01 Interrogatories. Plaintiff to file interrogatories by 9/28/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 9/7/2022. (kric, )
Related: [-]
misc Entry Deletion Wed 09/07 1:53 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 4 Notice of Attorney to retain counsel admitted to Federal Bar, 5 Document emailed, 6 Document mailed. Reason: chambers request, filed in error (kric, )
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Wed 09/07 1:56 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED 10 Entry Deletion placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jane Doe c/o Amanda Bostedo 369 Sherrill Drive Blacksburg, SC 29702 (kric, )
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Wed 09/07 3:06 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED12 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jane Doe c/o Amanda Bostedo 369 Sherrill Drive Blacksburg, SC 29702 with LR26.01 Interrogatories (kric, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 09/06 3:20 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Blacksburg Middle School, Carl Carpenter, Cherokee County School District, Cherokee County School District Board of Trustees, Cherokee County School District Office of Superintendent, Dana Fall.(kric, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 09/06 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cherokee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-110499. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10683427), filed by Cherokee County School District Board of Trustees, Cherokee County School District Office of Superintendent, Carl Carpenter, Blacksburg Middle School, Dana Fall, Cherokee County School District.(kric, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Removal,
Att: 3 Notice of filing of removal to plaintiff