California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:M Elaine Hammond
Case #: 5:22-bk-50797
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Sep 29, 2022
Terminated:Oct 06, 2022

Debtor
Conleff Plumbing Supply, Inc.
PO Box 553
Redwood Estates, CA 95044-0553
Represented By
Brette L. Evans
Evans Law Offices
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Kari Bowyer
P.O. Box 700096
San Jose, CA 95170
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113


Docket last updated: 09/07/2022 12:01 AM PDT
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
crditcrd none Tue 09/06 4:58 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 22-50797 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A32122451, amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 09/06 4:52 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $338. Filed by Conleff Plumbing Supply, Inc.. Incomplete Filings due by 09/20/2022. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 09/20/2022. (Evans, Brette)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Tue 09/06 5:01 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/29/2022 at 11:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (Evans, Brette)
Related: [-]