Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jeffrey M Bryan
Referred: John F Docherty
Case #: 0:22-cv-02173
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2022
Last checked: Monday Mar 06, 2023 4:43 AM CST
Defendant
H.B. Fuller Company
Represented By
Sharon Robin Markowitz
Stinson LLP
contact info
Andrew Leiendecker
Stinson LLP
contact info
Defendant
H.B. Fuller Construction Products, Inc.
Represented By
Sharon Robin Markowitz
Stinson LLP
contact info
Andrew Leiendecker
Stinson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jenna Drouin
Represented By
David W Asp
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Robert David Hahn
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
David Frederick Hine
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Petra Bergman
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Eric W Richardson
Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Emily St. Cyr
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Drouin
Represented By
David W Asp
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Robert David Hahn
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
David Frederick Hine
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Petra Bergman
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Eric W Richardson
Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Emily St. Cyr
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Juston Rouse
Represented By
David W Asp
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Robert David Hahn
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
David Frederick Hine
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Petra Bergman
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Eric W Richardson
Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Emily St. Cyr
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Rouse
Represented By
David W Asp
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Robert David Hahn
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
David Frederick Hine
Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Petra Bergman
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Eric W Richardson
Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Emily St. Cyr
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 26 2023
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; and further directing. LET JUDGEMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/26/2023. (RMM) Modified text on 9/27/2023 (MMP).
GPO Sep 27 2023
AMENDED ORDER re 84 Order on Motion to Dismiss/General. Judgment language removed. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/26/2023.(RMM)
GPO Aug 07 2024
ORDER DISMISSING Sean Mulvey (individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated) without prejudice. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 8/7/2024. (LIA)
GPO Oct 18 2024
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 185 Motion to Dismiss/General (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 10/18/2024. (LIA)
GPO Dec 04 2024
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 273 Motion to Compel (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 12/4/2024. (DRD)
GPO Feb 03 2025
ORDER in Response to Dkt. Nos. 397 and 400. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 2/3/2025. (DRD)
GPO Feb 21 2025
(LIA)ORDER denying 291 ORDER RE: APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge; denying 293 ORDER RE: APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 2/21/2025.

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
450 450 order Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court Tue 03/18 3:47 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT: At the March 11, 2025 Case Management Conference 444 , the Court ordered Defendants to submit unredacted copies of the documents subject to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel426 to the Court for ex parte, in camera review. The Court has not received those documents. Defendants are ordered to submit them by close of business on Friday, March 21, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/18/2025. (DRD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
449 449 misc Transcript Mon 03/17 1:10 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Plaintiffs' & Defendants' Motions held on 3/11/2025 before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (41 pages). Court Reporter: Tim Willette. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents . Parties have 21 days to file a Statement of Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review [LINK:Local Rule 5.5] and Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings . Statement of Redaction due 4/7/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/17/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2025. (TJW)
Related: [-]
448 448 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Mon 03/17 11:21 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER rescheduling hearing: The April 22, 2025 case management conference is RESCHEDULED to May 1, 2025 at 1 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Docherty. The joint agenda and any moving party IDR letters are now due 4/24/2025. Any responding party IDR letters are due 4/29/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/17/2025.(TJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
447 447 misc Transcript Request Wed 03/12 11:17 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT 444 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,, to Court Reporter Tim Willette. (Hine, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
446 446 misc Transcript Request Tue 03/11 3:01 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of 444 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,, to Court Reporter Tim Willette. (Thomson, William)
Related: [-]
445 445 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Tue 03/11 2:55 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER rescheduling hearing: The April 11, 2025 case management conference is RESCHEDULED to April 22, 2025 at 1 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Docherty. The joint agenda and any moving party IDR letters are now due 4/15/2025. Any responding party IDR letters are due 4/18/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/11/2025.(TJS)
Related: [-]
444 444 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Compel Tue 03/11 2:23 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/11/2025: Oral Arguments Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: Tim Willette St. Paul Courthouse, Courtroom 6A Time: 1:00-1:51 Total Time: 51 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): David F. Hine For Defendant(s): Jeremy A. Root; Todd A Noteboom; Courtney Harrison; Laura Rose Hammargren PROCEEDINGS: Hearing on: 420 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's February 3, 2025 Order (Dkt. 401) filed by Kendra Graybeal, Brittany Witczak, Dave Robb, Nicole Robb, Gina Calamita, Nichole Edwards, Kristina De Broux, Lucas Edwards, Alexandra Andree, Andrea Lea Hill Whitenack, Robert Calamita, Jenna Drouin, Mary Jane Gougar, Lisa Rouse, Juston Rouse, Nicholas Drouin, Kyle Witczak, Clay Whitenack, Brian Andree, Chris Lorbecki, 426 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Complete and Unredacted Copies of Asset Purchase Agreement and Attached or Incorporated Documents filed by Kendra Graybeal, Brittany Witczak, Dave Robb, Nicole Robb, Gina Calamita, Nichole Edwards, Kristina De Broux, Lucas Edwards, Alexandra Andree, Andrea Lea Hill Whitenack, Robert Calamita, Jenna Drouin, Mary Jane Gougar, Nicholas Drouin, Juston Rouse, Lisa Rouse, Kyle Witczak, Brian Andree, Clay Whitenack, Chris Lorbecki. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court denies 420 Motion for Clarification. The Court orders Defendants to submit unredacted copies of the documents subject to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. 426 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is under advisement pending ex parte, in camera review of those documents. Written Order to follow. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (DRD)
Related: [-]