Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-17444
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2022
Last checked: Monday Mar 06, 2023 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
GLENN CHRISTOPHER MARQUEZ
Represented By
GARY ANTHONY ANDERSON
Environmental Litigation Group Pc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/15 9:59 AM
ORDER - The motions to amend complaints identified on Exhibit A are DENIED without prejudice with leave to re-file following the Eleventh Circuit's decision. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/15/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, March 13, 2023
3 3 motion Amend/Correct - for Requesting Leave of Court to Amend Mon 03/13 11:58 AM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct by GLENN CHRISTOPHER MARQUEZ. (ANDERSON, GARY)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/13 11:57 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by GLENN CHRISTOPHER MARQUEZ. (ANDERSON, GARY)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/13 1:30 PM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION to Amend1 Complaint. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/27/2023) . (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/07 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7430574.), filed by GLENN CHRISTOPHER MARQUEZ. (ANDERSON, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet