Arizona District Court
Judge:Stephen M Mcnamee
Case #: 2:14-cv-02057
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2014
Re-opened:Sep 05, 2023
Terminated:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 5:20 AM MST
Counter Claimant
Jack Daniel's Properties Incorporated
Represented By
Gregory Phillip Sitrick
Quarles & Brady Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Isaac Scott Crum
Quarles & Brady Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Christopher Craig Larkin
Seyfarth Shaw Llp - Los Angeles, Ca
contact info
Counter Claimant
VIP Products LLC
Represented By
David Geoffrey Bray
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Jack Daniel's Properties Incorporated
Represented By
Gregory Phillip Sitrick
Quarles & Brady Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Isaac Scott Crum
Quarles & Brady Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Christopher Craig Larkin
Seyfarth Shaw Llp - Los Angeles, Ca
contact info
Counter Defendant
VIP Products LLC
Represented By
David Geoffrey Bray
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jack Daniel's Properties Incorporated
Represented By
Gregory Phillip Sitrick
Quarles & Brady Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Isaac Scott Crum
Quarles & Brady Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Christopher Craig Larkin
Seyfarth Shaw Llp - Los Angeles, Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
VIP Products LLC
Represented By
David Geoffrey Bray
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info

GPO May 15 2015
ORDER granting 31 Motion to Amend/Correct. VIP shall file its amended documents on or before 5/20/2015. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/15/2015.(DGC, nvo)
GPO Sep 27 2016
MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER: Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment 101 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 110 is denied. Plaintiff's motion to exclude the testimony of Defendant's expert 92 is denied. Plaintiff's motion to exclude Defendant's supplemental declaration 133 is denied. Plaintiff's motion for clarification 88 is denied as moot. The parties' stipulated motion to file documents under seal 152 is denied as moot. Defendant's motion to seal 162 is denied as moot. Status Hearing is set for 10/26/2016 at 2:00 p.m. See order for additional details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/27/2016.(LMR)
GPO Jan 30 2018
FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED finding in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff on all remaining claims. Plaintiff is liable on all claims asserted by Defendant in this case. Defendant is directed to file a proposed form of injunction by Friday, February 23, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Defendant's Fourth and Fifth Motions in Limine. (Docs. 194, 195.) Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/29/2018. (REK)
GPO Jan 23 2025
AMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Jack Daniel's Products, Inc. is entitled to judgment in its favor against VIP Products, LLC on Jack Daniel's trademark and trade dress dilution counterclaims pursuant to the Lanham Act, 15 U.S.C. § 1125, and Arizona's antidilution statute, A.R.S. § 44-1448.01. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that VIP Products LLC is not liable to Jack Daniel's on Jack Daniel's trademark and trade dress infringement counterclaims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc. to file a proposed form of injunction within thirty (30) days of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/21/2025. (KLG)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, March 31, 2025
384 384 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 03/31 12:12 PM
USCA Case Number re:381 Notice of Appeal. Case number 25-2027 Ninth Circuit. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
383 383 misc Transcript Request Wed 03/26 12:16 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jack Daniel's Properties Incorporated for proceedings held on 12/03/2024, Judge Stephen M McNamee hearing judge(s). (Saharia, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
382 382 misc Transcript Tue 03/25 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of ORAL ARGUMENT proceedings held on 12/03/2024 before Judge STEPHEN M. MCNAMEE. [Court Reporter: Andrea K. Bluedorn, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7245]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 4/14/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2025. (RAP)
Related: [-]