Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:22-ap-03095
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2022
Terminated:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Matthew Easterling
Represented By
Matthew Easterling
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Robert S. Westermann
Hirschler Fleischer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
15 15 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 08/06 12:58 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 08/01 10:56 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
13 13 misc Certificate of Service of Discovery Documents Tue 05/16 1:10 PM
Certificate of Service of Discovery Documents and Initial Disclosures filed by David I. Swan of Hirschler Fleischer PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Swan, David)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 16, 2023
12 12 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 04/17 12:11 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Pre-Trial Order
Friday, April 14, 2023
11 11 court Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/14 1:48 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing. A copy of this document was mailed by first class mail postage prepaid to Matthew Easterling as required by the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rules. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Pre-Trial Order
10 10 order Pre-Trial Order Fri 04/14 11:47 AM
Pre-Trial Discovery Scheduling Order; Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, March 30, 2023
9 9 court Pre-Trial Conference Held Thu 03/30 1:28 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held; Parties to Submit Proposed Pre-Trial Order. Mr. Easterling to file Certification Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 2090-1 by 4/13/2023. Appearance(s): David Swan for Plaintiff; Matthew Easterling, Defendant Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
8 8 court Pre-Trial Conference Continued Tue 02/21 12:13 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued per agenda filed in bankruptcy case 15-32919 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/30/2023 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia, (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, February 02, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 02/02 1:40 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 2/21/2023 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Mediator Certification of Compliance filed by Peter M. Pearl, Mediator
Friday, January 20, 2023
6 6 misc Mediator Certification of Compliance Fri 01/20 2:18 PM
Mediator Certification of Compliance filed by Peter M. Pearl of Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC on behalf of Peter M. Pearl, Mediator. (Pearl, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
5 5 answer None Thu 10/06 4:12 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Matthew Easterling. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/13 1:48 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Thursday, September 08, 2022
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 09/08 2:51 PM
Summons and notice issued to Matthew Easterling Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/08 11:04 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-03095 KRH] ) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A34686110, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 09/08 10:43 AM
Adversary case 22-03095 Complaint against Matthew Easterling filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]