Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:22-ap-03103
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2022
Terminated:Feb 14, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Therapy Place, Inc.
Represented By
The Therapy Place, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Robert S. Westermann
Hirschler Fleischer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
6 6 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 02/14 5:52 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 02/07 11:14 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/13 2:18 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Thursday, September 08, 2022
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 09/08 3:10 PM
Summons and notice issued to The Therapy Place, Inc. Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/08 11:04 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-03103 KRH] ) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A34686110, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 09/08 10:59 AM
Adversary case 22-03103 Complaint against The Therapy Place, Inc. filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]