Puerto Rico Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mildred Caban Flores
Case #: 3:22-bk-02670
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Feb 10, 2023

Debtor
LABORATORIO ACROPILIS INC.
URB. VILLA BEATRIZ D-6
MANATI, PR 00674
Represented By
GLORIA JUSTINIANO IRIZARRY
Justiniano'S Law Office
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
OFFICE OF THE US TRUSTEE (UST) OCHOA BUILDING 500 TANCA STREET SUITE 301
SAN JUAN, PR 00901


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, March 09, 2023
78 78 misc Certificate of service Fri 03/10 1:35 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 03/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 77
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
77 77 order Compensation Granted Tue 03/07 9:26 AM
ORDER Granting Application for Compensation for DIANA TORRES CANCEL, fees awarded: $3,825.00; expenses awarded: $0.00 Related [+] signed on 3/7/2023 .(AGUAYO LOPEZ, BRENDA)
Related: [-] 70