Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Case #: 3:22-cv-01990
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2022
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Petitioner
LaTodd Detray Alexander
Respondent
USA

GPO Feb 20 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - The motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is DENIED and this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/20/2024) (chmb)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, February 26, 2024
misc Order Receipt Mon 02/26 1:42 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9,10. Mon Feb 26 13:42:23 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
10 10 order Judgment Tue 02/20 3:50 PM
JUDGMENT - This action came on for consideration by the court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the motion to vacate sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is DENIED and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/20/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
9 9 4 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Tue 02/20 3:49 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - The motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is DENIED and this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/20/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
8 8 respm Response/Objection Wed 12/14 3:07 PM
RESPONSE filed by USA re: 6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,1 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255,, (Mitchell-DOJ, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel - AUSA - AFPD Wed 12/07 9:38 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Brian W McKay-DOJ for USA, for Samuel Eugene Warrick, Guillermo Zarco Villasenor, Revion Daymon Long, Freddie Thomas Gilbert, Jose Santillan, Dominic Rodriguez, Brandon Jamaal Rambo, Arturo Salazar, Antonyo Reece, Celestine Okwilagwe, Quentin Alonso Cordova, Cesar Geovanny Aguilar Mateo, Cesar Geovanny Aguilar Mateo,John Daniel Martin, Miriam Crystal Herrera, Alfredo Trejo, Chupee Ernest Joe, Faizal Sabar, Noble U Ezukanma, Sherman Lakeith Ross, Darrell Wise, Norberto Fernandez Hernandez, Erika Mireya Ramirez Luna, Nykees Earl Campbell, Robert Darren Moore, Sergio Amaya-Martinez, James Henry Kelley, Jesus Guerra-Sanchez, Rafael Jimenez Vasquez, Jose Luis Torres, Raul Fuentes, Santa Ignacia Carcamo-Robles, Aaron Dewayne Marrs, Josue Emmanuel Martinez, Emilio Marquez Gomez, Donald Matthew Basta, Alvaro Jovani Rangel-Ramirez, Rocky Freeland Anderson, Justin Lee Belbey, Tarance Bickems, Acacedric Rashod Ware, Miguel Angel Saustegui-Perez, Antonio Lorensito Garrido, Christian Caballero, Marco Antonio Murillo, Antonio Flores, Demarcus Davis, Anthony Herman Lucio, Patricia B Armstrong, Antwaine Enta Yarbrough, Airun Damon Dunn, Edward Jennings, Dinesh Sah, Robert Earl Ramseur, Eduardo Angel Hernandez, Efrain Hernandez Esparza, Dominique Lashante Green, David Earl Kates, Catherine Salas, Alexander Rosenblatt, Jacques Roy, Sean Paul Dalka, Royce Wade Lander, Diego Gutierrez Pinales, Ronald Lee Miller, Terrance Reginald Brown, Jesus Julian Corona-Perez, Erasmus Tachmonite Watson, Jedarius Lowery, Michael Dasean Robinson, Kendrick Lamel Washington, Justin Ray Monroe, Robert Darren Moore, Elias Lopez-Hernandez, Larry Solomon, Moises Jimenez, Michael Wright, Terry Lynn Anderson, Idrissa Traore, Alejandro Hernandez, Jason Carl Taylor, Olufemi Sadiq, Donald Paul Brewer, Christopher Jamaine Lorick, Sabela Villarreal, Jose Antonio Valdez-Villalobos, Rosalio Ramos Tapia, Demarcus Rakestraw, Sean Alexander Harris, David Sheppard, Ronald David McCalister, Michael Wafer, Lenthell Lalince Rosemond, Tanya Marie Regan, Oscar Segura-Resendez, Rodney Gardner, Anthony Keith Freeney, Gilberto Gomez, Macario Andrew Gomez, LaTodd Detray Alexander, Khayree Dewayne Davis, Joydeth Robinson, Darren Douglas Johnson, Darrell Anthony Donaldson, Rosa Leija-Peralta, Kyle Martin Hermesch, William Theodore Bradley, Johnny Glenn Clifton, Roberto Elias Martinez, Joshua Paul Cox, Michael Charles Braddick, Franklin Lee Hudgens, Aaron Tremmell Hardrick, Luis Gonzales, O B Thompson, Hugh Michael Glenn, Shelvin Lynn Holman, Ralph Jay Adams, Rickey Lavell Jennings, David Caballero, Juan Jose Ramirez, Melissa Sue Batten, Manuel Dimas Guerra, Abel Segundo Cardenas, Eric Douglas Johnson, John Martin Cabello, Sandra Cantu, Keilon Vidal Sanders, Christopher James Regan, Jeffrey Ndungi Sila, Datanya Damon Alexander, Alvin Christopher Penn, Fernando Fabian Alvarez, Jose Maria Uvalle, Carol Monic Barajas, Nicholas Evans, Jose Ulises Facio-Gomez, Jose Vega, Cynthia Stiger, Stephen Christopher Plunkett, Derrick Daeyon Murrell, Jimmy Hatchett, Carlos Camacho, Frank Chazarreta, Jeremy Damon Ross, Bryce Edward Hansen, Homero Perez-Estrada, Tyrone Alexander Taylor, Derrick House, Wilbert James Veasey, Cyze Ajjan Rodgers, Orfilia Sanchez Benitez, Qumain Black, Treveon Dominique Anderson, Byron Anthony Horn, Johnathan Daniel Paris, Leigha A Simonton-DOJ terminated. (cea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case List
Monday, November 14, 2022
5 5 motion Extension of Time Mon 11/14 1:52 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Section 2255 Motion filed by USA (Mitchell-DOJ, Amy)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 11/14 3:35 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting5 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 2255. Responses due by 12/15/2022. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/14/2022) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel - AUSA - AFPD Thu 09/22 2:39 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Amy J Mitchell-DOJ added as AUSA. (Mitchell-DOJ, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
3 3 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer Tue 09/13 12:31 PM
ORDER AND INSTRUCTIONS TO PARTIES IN A MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255: United States Attorney is ORDERED to file an Answer or Response to the instant motion no later than November 15, 2022. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Leigha A Simonton-DOJ for USA added. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/13/2022) (svc)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 09/13 12:32 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Tue Sep 13 12:32:11 CDT 2022 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
misc Order Receipt Thu 09/08 1:31 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Thu Sep 8 13:31:01 CDT 2022 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Thu 09/08 1:29 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mla)
Related: [-]
1 1 mot2255 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 Thu 09/08 1:29 PM
MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 3:19-cr-78) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla)
Related: [-]