California Southern District Court
Judge:Linda Lopez
Referred: David D Leshner
Case #: 3:22-cv-01354
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2022
Terminated:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 08, 2023 1:04 AM PST
Cross Defendant
A BRIGHT IDEA SERVICES, INC.
1135 Terminal Way #209
RENO, NV 89502
Cross Defendant
MARK SPAHN
1135 Terminal Way #209
RENO, NV 89502
Defendant
Clear Blue Energy Corporation
Represented By
Andrew Charles Carlton
Carlton & Alberola
contact info
Defendant
Denise Kelly
Represented By
Andrew Charles Carlton
Carlton & Alberola
contact info
Defendant
James Kelly
Represented By
Andrew Charles Carlton
Carlton & Alberola
contact info
Defendant
Lyn Santina
Represented By
Andrew Charles Carlton
Carlton & Alberola
contact info
Defendant
Paul Santina
Represented By
Andrew Charles Carlton
Carlton & Alberola
contact info
Plaintiff
Western National Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Angela A. Zanin
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Gina G. Goldberg
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Mark A. Oertel
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
A BRIGHT IDEA SERVICES, INC.
1135 Terminal Way #209
RENO, NV 89502
Represented By
Benjamin D Koegel
Elguindy, Meyer & Koegel, Apc
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
MARK SPAHN
1135 Terminal Way #209
RENO, NV 89502
Represented By
Benjamin D Koegel
Elguindy, Meyer & Koegel, Apc
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
James Kelly
Represented By
Andrew Charles Carlton
Carlton & Alberola
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Denise Kelly
Represented By
Andrew Charles Carlton
Carlton & Alberola
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Clear Blue Energy Corporation
Represented By
Andrew Charles Carlton
Carlton & Alberola
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Lyn Santina
Represented By
Andrew Charles Carlton
Carlton & Alberola
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Paul Santina
Represented By
Andrew Charles Carlton
Carlton & Alberola
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, November 07, 2024
65 65 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 11/07 4:33 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Cross- Complainants state law claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3). The cross-complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ECF No.6 . Case is closed. (ddf)
Related: [-]
64 64 6 pgs order Order Thu 11/07 4:30 PM
ORDER Dismissing Cross-Complaint Without Prejudice And Closing Case.. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 11/7/2024.(ddf)
Related: [-]