Georgia Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Austin E Carter
Case #: 5:22-bk-51044
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Feb 10, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Macon Door & Hardware, Inc.
PO Box 4297
Macon, GA 31208-4241
Represented By
Ward Stone, Jr.
Stone & Baxter, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee - MAC
440 Martin Luther King Jr. Boulevard Suite 302
Macon, GA 31201


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 12:00 PM EDT
Saturday, December 23, 2023
255 255 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/24 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 254 Memo Regarding Monthly Report
Thursday, December 21, 2023
254 254 court Memo Regarding Monthly Report Thu 12/21 9:21 AM
Memo Regarding Monthly Report to the US Trustee;. DIP Report due by 1/22/2024. (Heyward, L)
Related: [-]