Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean F Cox
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:22-cv-12146
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2022
Terminated:Nov 03, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 08, 2023 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
Carsmetology
Plaintiff
Cameron Brenen
Represented By
Noah S. Hurwitz
Hurwitz Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
5 5 notice Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/02 10:27 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Hurwitz, Noah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
4 4 order Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute* Tue 11/01 3:52 PM
ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 11/15/2022. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
3 3 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/20 10:40 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Hurwitz, Noah)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued* Mon 09/12 11:42 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Carsmetology* (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 09/09 6:24 PM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9049146 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Jackson. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Hurwitz, Noah)
Related: [-]