Montana District Court
Case #: 4:22-cr-00067
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Sep 10, 2022 1:32 AM MDT
Defendant
Zachary Paul Potts (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ethan Plaut
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Great Falls
contact info

GPO Mar 16 2023
FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE regarding 33 Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Zachary Paul Potts (1). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/16/2023. (MMS)
GPO Nov 06 2023
ORDER denying 43 Motion to Vacate (2255) as to Zachary Paul Potts (1). A certificate of appealability is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/6/2023. Mailed to Potts at Forrest City (TAG)
GPO Nov 07 2023
AMENDED ORDER as to Zachary Paul Potts re 48 Order on Motion to Vacate (2255). Motion to vacate, set aside, or correct his sentence 43 is DENIED. A certificate of appealability is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/7/2023. (Mailed to Potts at Forrest City) (MMS)

Docket last updated: 09/10/2022 2:17 AM MDT
Thursday, September 08, 2022
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Zachary Paul Potts (1) counts 1, 2-3. (TLO)
Related: [-]
2 2 Redacted Indictment as to Zachary Paul Potts. (TLO)
Related: [-]
3 3 Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA regarding the1 Indictment (Sealed) as to Zachary Paul Potts. (TLO)
Related: [-]