Case Filed:Sep 09, 2022
Last checked: Monday Sep 12, 2022 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Timothy Allen Williams, Jr. (1)
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 09/12/2022 3:34 AM EDT
Friday, September 09, 2022
Arrest (Rule 5) of Timothy Allen Williams, Jr. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Timothy Allen Williams, Jr: Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 9/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Greenville Annex Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
1 1 Supervised Release Violation as to Timothy Allen Williams, Jr. Western District of North Carolina case. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Warrant- Restricted Viewing