New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:22-bk-17212
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2022
Dismissed:Dec 06, 2022
Terminated:Dec 22, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC
457 Wilson Ave
Newark, NJ 07105-4809
Represented By
Avram D White
Law Offices Of Avram D White, Esq
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Thursday, December 22, 2022
order Final Decree Thu 12/22 9:06 AM
Final Decree; The following parties were served: Trustee and US Trustee. (dlr)
Related: [-]
utility Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 12/22 9:08 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (dlr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
46 46 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 12/09 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/08/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
45 45 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 12/09 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/08/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
44 44 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case Fri 12/09 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 12/08/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
43 43 order Dismiss Case Tue 12/06 6:10 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case for Debtor Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/6/2022. (jf)
Related: [-] 27
court Hearing Held Wed 12/07 11:42 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted Revised Order Related [+] (mcp)
Related: [-] 27 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC
court Hearing Held Wed 12/07 11:44 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Moot, Case Dismissed Related [+] (mcp)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Hearing (Upload)
Monday, December 05, 2022
42 42 misc Support Mon 12/05 9:07 AM
Letter regarding Debtor 341 attendance in support of Related [+] filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. (White, Avram)
Related: [-] 27 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC,40 Document filed by Creditor PMC, Inc.,41 Response filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
41 41 answer Response Tue 11/29 2:54 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by U.S. Trustee. (United States Trustee by Peter J. D'Auria)
Related: [-] 27 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Unable to propose confirmable plan. Filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/6/2022 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Application in Support of Motion to dismiss Chapter 11 Case # 2 Proposed Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case) filed by Debtor FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC
40 40 misc Document Tue 11/29 1:59 PM
Document re: Joinder of PMC, Inc. to Debtor's Motion for Order Dismissing Case Related [+] filed by Douglas G. Leney on behalf of PMC, Inc.. (Leney, Douglas)
Related: [-] 27 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 28, 2022
39 39 misc Withdrawal of Document Mon 11/28 3:30 PM
Withdrawal of Document Related [+] filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. (White, Avram)
Related: [-] 30 Motion To Reinstate Stay filed by Debtor FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC,36 Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors
Thursday, November 24, 2022
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Notice (generic) Fri 11/25 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 11/24/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
37 37 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/22 1:00 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. (White, Avram)
Related: [-] 30 Motion To Reinstate Stay filed by Debtor FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC,31 Application to Shorten Time filed by Debtor FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC,32 Order on Application to Shorten Time
court Hearing Held Tue 12/06 6:09 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Motion withdrawn Related [+] (jf)
Related: [-] 30 Motion To Reinstate Stay filed by FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC
Monday, November 21, 2022
court Meeting of Creditors Adjourned (Continued) Mon 11/21 1:27 PM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors.. 341(a) Meeting Continued to 12/2/2022 at 11:00 AM at Telephonic. (Fuentes, Neidy)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 20, 2022
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 11/21 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/20/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 11/21 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/20/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
33 33 order Retention Fri 11/18 3:02 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ White and Co., LLC as Counsel to the Debtor. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/18/2022. (rah)
Related: [-] 28
32 32 order Shorten Time Fri 11/18 12:05 PM
Order Granting Application to Shorten Time Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/18/2022. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 02:30 PM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
Related: [-] 30 Motion To Reinstate Stay filed by Debtor FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC
Thursday, November 17, 2022
31 31 motion Shorten Time Thu 11/17 5:36 PM
Application to Shorten Time Related [+] Filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. (White, Avram)
Related: [-] 30 Motion To Reinstate Stay filed by Debtor FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC
Att: 1 Proposed Order ALLOWING APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR A HEARING ON MOTION TO REINSTATE AUTOMATIC STAY TO REMOVE PERSONAL PROPERTY
30 30 motion Reinstate Stay Thu 11/17 5:34 PM
Motion To Reinstate Stay Filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. (White, Avram)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary
Att: 2 Certification OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REINSTATE AUTOMATIC STAY TO REMOVE PERSONAL PROPERTY
Att: 3 Proposed Order ALLOWING MOTION TO REINSTATE AUTOMATIC STAY TO REMOVE PERSONAL PROPERTY
Att: 4 Certificate of Service RELATING TO MOTION TO REINSTATE AUTOMATIC STAY TO REMOVE PERSONAL PROPERTY
Saturday, November 12, 2022
29 29 court BNC Hrg to Dismiss Case Sun 11/13 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Hearing to Dismiss Case. No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 11/12/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
28 28 motion Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Thu 11/10 10:45 AM
Application For Retention of Professional White and Co LLC as Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. Objection deadline is 11/17/2022. (White, Avram)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification in Support of Retention of Counsel
Att: 2 Proposed Order Allowing Retention of Counsel to Debtor
27 27 motion Dismiss Case Thu 11/10 9:29 AM
Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Unable to propose confirmable plan. Filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/6/2022 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (White, Avram)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application in Support of Motion to dismiss Chapter 11 Case
Att: 2 Proposed Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case
court Hearing Held and Continued Thu 11/10 2:55 PM
Minute of Hearing Held and Continued from 11/10/2022 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Hearing (Upload)
Friday, October 28, 2022
26 26 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Fri 10/28 11:59 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by U.S. Trustee. (United States Trustee by Peter J. D'Auria)
Related: [-]
trustee Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors Fri 10/28 12:05 PM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] filed by U.S. Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Continued to 11/2/2022 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic. (UST Staff03)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thursday, October 27, 2022
court Hearing Held and Continued Thu 10/27 12:28 PM
Minute of Status Conference Hearing Held and Continued from 10/27/2022 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2022 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Hearing (Upload)
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 10/27 3:38 PM
Adversary Case (2:22-ap-1306) Closed. (jf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
25 25 misc Ch. 11 Small Business Statement of No Documents Tue 10/18 10:06 AM
Statement that No Documents Required by U.S.C. 1116 Have Been Filed or Prepared filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. (White, Avram)
Related: [-]
utility Remark re: Missing Documents Filed Tue 10/18 2:42 PM
Remark. STILL MISSING: No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (dlr)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Tue 10/18 3:29 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Satisfied Related [+] (mcp)
Related: [-] 5 Show Cause
Thursday, October 06, 2022
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 10/07 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
utility Remark re: Missing Documents Filed Wed 10/05 9:06 AM
Remar Related [+]. STILL MISSING: Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Tax Return (dlr)
Related: [-] 5 Show Cause
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
23 23 order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) or Document(s) Tue 10/04 3:02 PM
Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) E/F Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/4/2022. (dlr)
Related: [-] 22 Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) filed by Debtor FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC
22 22 misc Amended Schedules (Fee) - Use for All Amended Schedules Tue 10/04 10:26 AM
Amended Schedule(s) : E/F,Summary of Schedules,Other Schedules re:Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Fee Amount $ 32 filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. (White, Avram)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Tue 10/04 10:01 AM
Missing Document(s): 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. (White, Avram)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Tue 10/04 9:53 AM
Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. (White, Avram)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Tue 10/04 10:27 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney)([LINK 22-17212 VFP] ) [misc,amdsch3a] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44445940, fee amount $ 32.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#22
court Hearing Held and Continued Wed 10/05 2:31 PM
Minute of Hearing Held and Continued from 10/4/2022 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-] 5 Show Cause
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 09/29 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/28/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
18 18 order Relief from Stay Mon 09/26 3:56 PM
Consent Order Between Debtors and PMC, Inc. Regarding Motion for Determination That Automatic Stay Does Not Apply to Certain Real and Personal Property Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/26/2022. (mcp)
Related: [-] 10
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 09/26 2:57 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 9/27/2022 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2022 at 02:30 PM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by PMC, Inc.
Saturday, September 24, 2022
17 17 misc Certificate of Consent Sat 09/24 1:51 PM
Certificate of Consent Related [+]. Filed by Douglas G. Leney on behalf of PMC, Inc.. (Leney, Douglas)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Relief from Stay. Fee Amount $ 188. Filed by Douglas G. Leney on behalf of PMC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration - Lease # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration - Sublease # 3 Exhibit C to Declaration - 12/10/2021 Order # 4 Exhibit D to Declaration - Intervention Complaint # 5 Exhibit E to Declaration - 7/8/2022 Order # 6 Memorandum of Law # 7 Proposed Order No. 1 - Stay Is Not Applicable # 8 Proposed Order No. 2 - Vacating Stay) filed by Creditor PMC, Inc.
Thursday, September 22, 2022
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 09/23 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
15 15 cmp Complaint Tue 09/20 11:24 PM
Adversary case 22-01306 Complaint by FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC against PMC, LLC ; JOVALOR LLC. Fee Amount $ 350.. (72 (Injunctive relief - other)) (White, Avram)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order to Show Cause
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Jovalor Complaint
Att: 3 Exhibit B: Hudson County Superior Court Order December 2021
Att: 4 Exhibit C: Case Management Orders
Att: 5 Exhibit D: Answer and Counterclaim of FIORE HOLDINGS II
Att: 6 Exhibit E: Hudson County Superior Court Order July 2022
Att: 7 Exhibit F: Email Correspondence Post Petition
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/20 2:42 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Douglas G. Leney on behalf of PMC, Inc.. (Leney, Douglas)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor PMC, Inc.,11 Application to Shorten Time filed by Creditor PMC, Inc.,13 Order on Application to Shorten Time
Monday, September 19, 2022
13 13 order Shorten Time Mon 09/19 6:38 PM
Order Granting Application to Shorten Time Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/19/2022. Hearing scheduled for 9/27/2022 at 02:30 PM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Relief from Stay. Fee Amount $ 188. filed by Creditor PMC, Inc.
Friday, September 16, 2022
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 09/17 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/16/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Shorten Time Fri 09/16 8:58 AM
Application to Shorten Time Related [+] Filed by Douglas G. Leney on behalf of PMC, Inc.. (Leney, Douglas)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Relief from Stay. Fee Amount $ 188. filed by Creditor PMC, Inc.
Att: 1 Proposed Order Shortening Time
10 10 motion Relief from Stay (Fee) Fri 09/16 8:56 AM
Motion for Relief from Stay. Fee Amount $ 188. Filed by Douglas G. Leney on behalf of PMC, Inc.. (Leney, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Declaration - Lease
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Declaration - Sublease
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Declaration - 12/10/2021 Order
Att: 4 Exhibit D to Declaration - Intervention Complaint
Att: 5 Exhibit E to Declaration - 7/8/2022 Order
Att: 6 Memorandum of Law
Att: 7 Proposed Order No. 1 - Stay Is Not Applicable
Att: 8 Proposed Order No. 2 - Vacating Stay
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Fri 09/16 9:01 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 22-17212 VFP] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44377820, fee amount $ 188.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#10
Thursday, September 15, 2022
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 09/16 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Fri 09/16 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 09/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Wed 09/14 6:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Douglas G. Leney on behalf of PMC, Inc.. (Leney, Douglas)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Notice of Hearing (Upload) Wed 09/14 9:03 AM
Notice of Hearing for: Chapter 11 Status Conference. Related [+]. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney and US Trustee. Status Conference Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/13/2023. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 07/10/2023. filed by Debtor FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
5 5 order Show Cause Tue 09/13 10:03 AM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/13/2022. Hearing scheduled for 10/4/2022 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (dlr)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Tue 09/13 9:10 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/19/2022 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 11/21/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 3/13/2023. (mlc)
Related: [-]
3 3 plan Chapter 13 Plan and Motions Tue 09/13 8:22 AM
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. (White, Avram)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned Tue 09/13 7:38 AM
Case Assignment. Judge Stacey L. Meisel removed from the case. Judge Vincent F. Papalia added to the case Due to Associated Case 22-15389 - Theodore Fiore, Sr.. (rah)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Tue 09/13 7:52 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 22-17212 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44359273, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
utility Remark Tue 09/13 9:50 AM
Remark . The debtor Chapter 13 Filing 22-15389 (dlr)
Related: [-]
court Notice of Docketing Error Tue 09/13 9:52 AM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: CHAPTER 13 PLAN AND MOTION FILED IN CHAPTER 11 CASE, filed by AVRAM D WHITE. (dlr)
Related: [-] 3 Chapter 13 Plan and Motions filed by Debtor FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC
Monday, September 12, 2022
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 09/12 7:27 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Avram D White on behalf of FIORE HOLDINGS II LLC. Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/13/2023. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 07/10/2023. (White, Avram)
Related: [-]