Colorado District Court
Judge:Charlotte N Sweeney
Referred: Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:22-cv-02359
Nature of Suit196 Contract - Franchise
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2022
Terminated:May 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 12, 2023 1:38 AM MST
Defendant
General Motors, LLC
Represented By
William F. Benson
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
James C. McGrath
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company
Represented By
Jason T. Allen
Bass Sox Mercer PA
contact info
Jeremiah Mahlon Hawkes
Bass Sox Mercer PA
contact info
William Kirby Bissell
Bass Sox Mercer PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 10, 2024
49 49 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Fri 05/10 9:52 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the text-only Minute Order filed in this case on 5/10/24 at ECF No. 48. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
48 48 order Minute Order Fri 05/10 9:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER re:47 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. The Court orders that this case be dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees and other litigation expenses. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 5/10/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
Related: [-]
47 47 misc Stipulation Fri 05/10 8:53 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Plaintiff Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company. (Bissell, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
46 46 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 01/25 4:07 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 25 January 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order44 is GRANTED. The discovery deadline is extended to April 19, 2024, solely for the purpose of taking expert depositions. The dispositive motions deadline is extended to May 17, 2024. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
45 45 order Memorandum Thu 01/25 3:40 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding44 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Upcoming Deadlines in Scheduling Order. Motion44 is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 1/25/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja. )
Related: [-]
44 44 motion Extension of Time Thu 01/25 2:46 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Upcoming Deadlines in Scheduling Order by Defendant General Motors, LLC. (Benson, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
43 43 order Minute Order Wed 01/24 12:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2024 is VACATED and RESET for 7/24/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. The parties' Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 7/17/2024. In addition to filing, please email the proposed order in editable format to Sweeney_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 1/24/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja. )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
42 42 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 11/24 6:47 AM
ANSWER to41 Amended Complaint by General Motors, LLC.(Benson, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
41 41 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/02 1:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company, filed by Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company.(Allen, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
40 40 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Tue 10/31 4:15 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 31 October 2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Stipulation and Proposed Order38 , which is construed as a Motion, is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a clean copy of the First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, changing the title to reflect that it is the First Amended Complaint, on the electronic record by November 2, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Order is amended as reflected herein. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
39 39 order Memorandum Wed 10/11 12:11 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding38 STIPULATION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND EXTENSION OF SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion38 is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 10/11/2023. Text Only Entry (cnsja.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
38 38 misc Stipulation Tue 10/10 1:58 PM
STIPULATION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND EXTENSION OF SCHEDULING ORDER by Plaintiff Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company.(Bissell, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Exhibit B - Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 09/28 11:26 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 27 September 2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order35 is GRANTED. The Discovery Cutoff is extended to October 6, 2023. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
36 36 order Memorandum Fri 09/22 2:22 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Scheduling Order. Motion35 is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 9/22/2023. Text Only Entry (cnsja. )
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Extension of Time Fri 09/22 1:37 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company. (Bissell, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
34 34 misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Tue 08/08 8:48 AM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella upon her appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Starnella at the end of the civil action number (such as 22-cv-02359-CNS-KAS). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Starnella in Courtroom C-204. Her chambers are located in Room C-253 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. Her telephone number is 303-335-2770. (Text only entry) (blaws)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
33 33 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 07/21 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Andrew G. Thomas by Andrew G. Thomas on behalf of Rickenbaugh Cadillac CompanyAttorney Andrew G. Thomas added to party Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company(pty:pla) (Thomas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 06/08 3:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on June 8, 2023. This matter is before the Court on the Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order30 (the "Motion"). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion30 is GRANTED. The SchedulingOrder is amended to reflect the following deadlines: Discovery Cutoff (except as to expert depositions) September 29, 2023 Affirmative Expert Disclosure Deadline November 1, 2023 Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline December 15, 2023Expert Depositions January 19, 2024 Dispositive Motions Deadline February 15, 2024(csarr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
31 31 order Order Referring Motion Wed 06/07 1:47 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions filed by General Motors, LLC.referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 6/7/23. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Extension of Time Wed 06/07 12:47 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions by Defendant General Motors, LLC. (Benson, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
29 29 order Protective Order Thu 12/15 3:56 PM
STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ON CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on December 15, 2022. (csarr, )
Related: [-]
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 12/15 3:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on December 15, 2022. This matter is before the Court on the Joint Motion to Enter Protective Order26 (the "Motion"). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion26 is GRANTED. The Protective Order [26-1] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing, with interlineations, and entered as an Order of the Court as of the date of this Minute Order.(csarr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
26 26 motion Protective Order Wed 12/14 1:08 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant General Motors, LLC.(Benson, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order
order Memorandum Wed 12/14 2:22 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding26 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by General Motors, LLC. Motion26 is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 12/14/2022. Text Only Entry (cnssec.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
order Minute Order Mon 12/05 3:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER: A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/13/2024 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. The parties' Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 3/6/2024. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 12/5/2022. Text Only Entry (cnssec.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
24 24 order Scheduling Order Fri 12/02 11:16 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on December 2, 2022. (cpomm, )
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 12/02 11:15 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held on 12/2/2022 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: FTR: A-401. (cpomm, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Requirements of Practice
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
22 22 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 11/22 3:27 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company. (Bissell, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
21 21 2 pgs order Order Mon 11/14 10:51 AM
PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10 November 2022. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Thu 11/10 2:07 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear At Scheduling Conference By Telephone by Defendant General Motors, LLC. (Benson, William)
Related: [-]
order Memorandum Thu 11/10 2:11 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding18 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear At Scheduling Conference By Telephone. Motion18 is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 11/10/2022. Text Only Entry (cnssec.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Thu 11/10 3:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting the Joint Motion to Appear at Scheduling Conference by Telephone [#18]. Participating counsel or parties shall call the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on November 10, 2022. Text Only Entry(klmlc1, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
order Minute Order Tue 11/01 3:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Due to a scheduling conflict, the Scheduling Conference set for December 1, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to December 2, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. The proposed Scheduling Order is due by November 25, 2022. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on November 1, 2022. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/21 12:30 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Bissell, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/20 1:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by General Motors, LLC.(Benson, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
14 14 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint Wed 10/05 10:21 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant General Motors, LLC. General Motors, LLC answer due 10/21/2022. (Benson, William)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/05 9:27 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holding LLC for General Motors, LLC. (Benson, William)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 10/05 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William F. Benson on behalf of General Motors, LLCAttorney William F. Benson added to party General Motors, LLC(pty:dft) (Benson, William)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 10/05 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James C. McGrath on behalf of General Motors, LLCAttorney James C. McGrath added to party General Motors, LLC(pty:dft) (McGrath, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
10 10 3 pgs order Order Thu 09/29 4:29 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/29/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/24/2022. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 12/1/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (alave, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 3 Continuation of Main Document
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 09/14 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeremiah Mahlon Hawkes on behalf of Rickenbaugh Cadillac CompanyAttorney Jeremiah Mahlon Hawkes added to party Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company(pty:pla) (Hawkes, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 09/14 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Kirby Bissell on behalf of Rickenbaugh Cadillac CompanyAttorney William Kirby Bissell added to party Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company(pty:pla) (Bissell, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs misc Memorandum Returning Case Wed 09/14 9:38 AM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-02359-CNS. (athom, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement Wed 09/14 7:43 AM
STATEMENT re1 Complaint, CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company. (Allen, Jason)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 09/14 10:15 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 9/14/2022. Text Only Entry (cnssec. )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
4 4 misc Summons Issued Tue 09/13 2:20 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (tgall, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
3 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Summons Request Tue 09/13 1:48 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to General Motors, LLC re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company. (Allen, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/13 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against General Motors, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8654587)Attorney Jason T. Allen added to party Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company(pty:pla), filed by Rickenbaugh Cadillac Company.(Allen, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A GM Dealer Sales and Service Agreement
misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 09/13 2:17 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
Related: [-]