Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Angel Kelley
Case #: 1:22-cv-11502
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:552 Right to Privacy Act
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2022
Terminated:Mar 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 12, 2023 5:06 AM EDT
Defendant
FloSports, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Melodia
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Andrew T Hambelton
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Rachel C. Agius
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Iaquinto
Holland & Knight
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher J. Fiorentino
Represented By
Nicomedes Sy Herrera
Herrera Kennedy LLP
contact info
Douglas I. Cuthbertson
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Michael K. Sheen
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC
contact info
Rachel J. Geman
Lieff Cabrase Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Shawn M. Kennedy
Herrera Kennedy LLP
contact info
Hannah Marie Crowe
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Carney Bates & Pulliam PLLC
contact info
Courtney Elizabeth Ross
Carney Bates & Pulliam PLLC
contact info
Charles A. Dirksen
Cera LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Cormier
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Lauren Michelle Cross
Burns Charest LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
76 76 7 pgs order Judgment Tue 03/05 6:29 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT entered. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
75 75 minutes Hearing - Other Fri 03/01 12:51 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Angel Kelley: Final Approval Hearing held on 3/1/2024. Case called. The Court heard the parties on the matter and took the matter under advisement. The Court will then enter the final approval order. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Bates and Sheen for Plaintiff; Iaquinto for Defendant) (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
74 74 order Order Lifting Stay Tue 02/27 5:54 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER LIFTING STAY.(Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]