New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:22-cv-07835
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12111 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2022
Terminated:Feb 08, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 12, 2023 5:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Jennifer Deo
in their professional capacities 145 East 32nd Street, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Salvatore Puccio
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Harpreet Kaur
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Shari Goldstein-Behar
in their professional capacities 145 East 32nd Street, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Salvatore Puccio
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Harpreet Kaur
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Wexler Dermatology, P.C.
145 East 32nd Street, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Salvatore Puccio
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Harpreet Kaur
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Eugene Wexler, M.D.
in their professional capacities 145 East 32nd Street, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Salvatore Puccio
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Harpreet Kaur
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Patricia Wexler, M.D.
in their professional capacities 145 East 32nd Street, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Salvatore Puccio
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Harpreet Kaur
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Madalyn Pedrosa
Represented By
Christopher J. Berlingieri
Berlingieri Law, PLLC
contact info
Melissa Alexis Rodriguez
Berlingieri Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 02/08 3:46 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court, having been advised at ECF No. 17 that the parties have reached a settlement, hereby ORDERS that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are cancelled. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 2/8/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
17 17 misc Letter Tue 02/07 2:51 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Christopher J Berlingieri dated 02/07/2023 re: Settlement. Document filed by Madalyn Pedrosa..(Berlingieri, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/30 9:43 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint,, against Jennifer Deo(in their personal capacities), Jennifer Deo(in their professional capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their personal capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their professional capacities), Wexler Dermatology, P.C., Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities), Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Madalyn Pedrosa. Related document:1 Complaint,,..(Berlingieri, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
15 15 3 pgs order Order Wed 01/25 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT This case has been reassigned to this Court. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jennifer-h-rearden. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the reassignment. Any conference or oral argument before or directed by the Magistrate Judge will proceed as ordered. However, all previously scheduled appearances or conferences before the District Judge are hereby adjourned pending further notice from the Court. Within two weeks of the filing of this Order, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter updating the Court on the status of the case. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) double-spaced pages. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel need not submit the joint letter or appear, provided that a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other appropriate proof of termination is filed on the docket prior to the joint letter submission deadline, using the proper ECF Filing Event. See S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions §§ 13.17-13.18, 13.20. Requests for extensions or adjournment of dates not affected by this Order may be made only in accordance with the Courts Individual Rules and Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jennifer-h-rearden.(And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 1/25/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Fri 01/13 11:17 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Judge Katherine Polk Failla is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
14 14 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 01/04 10:18 AM
STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys, that the Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, Tenth, Eleventh, Twelfth, Thirteenth and Fourteenth Causes of Action in Plaintiff's Complaint dated September 13, 2022 are hereby withdrawn with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Plaintiff shall amend the Complaint to reflect the discontinuance of the aforementioned claims and shall serve and file her Amended Complaint on or before February 3, 2023. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants shall answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before March 5, 2023. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/3/2023.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/4/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
13 13 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 01/03 10:28 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Madalyn Pedrosa..(Berlingieri, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 12/16 11:27 AM
STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys, that Defendants' time to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in this action is hereby extended to and including January 5, 2023; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that the stipulation may be executed in counterparts and facsimile signatures shall be deemed as originals. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 11. SO ORDERED., Motions terminated:11 MOTION for Extension of Time . filed by Jennifer Deo, Wexler Dermatology, P.C., Shari Goldstein-Behar, Eugene Wexler, M.D.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/16/2022) Jennifer Deo(in their personal capacities) answer due 1/5/2023; Jennifer Deo(in their professional capacities) answer due 1/5/2023; Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their personal capacities) answer due 1/5/2023; Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their professional capacities) answer due 1/5/2023; Wexler Dermatology, P.C. answer due 1/5/2023; Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities) answer due 1/5/2023; Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities) answer due 1/5/2023; Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities) answer due 1/5/2023; Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities) answer due 1/5/2023.( Motions due by 1/5/2023.) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
11 11 motion Extension of Time Thu 12/15 7:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time . Document filed by Jennifer Deo(in their personal capacities), Jennifer Deo(in their professional capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their personal capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their professional capacities), Wexler Dermatology, P.C., Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities), Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities)..(Kaur, Harpreet)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/29 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Alexis Rodriguez on behalf of Madalyn Pedrosa..(Rodriguez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
9 9 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 11/21 12:01 PM
STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys,that Defendants' time to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in this action is hereby extended to and including December 15, 2022; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that the stipulation may be executed in counterparts and facsimile signatures shall be deemed as originals. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate thepending motion at docket entry 7. SO ORDERED, Motions terminated:7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,, . filed by Jennifer Deo, Wexler Dermatology, P.C., Patricia Wexler, M.D., Shari Goldstein-Behar, Eugene Wexler, M.D.., (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/21/2022) Jennifer Deo(in their personal capacities) answer due 12/15/2022; Jennifer Deo(in their professional capacities) answer due 12/15/2022; Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their personal capacities) answer due 12/15/2022; Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their professional capacities) answer due 12/15/2022; Wexler Dermatology, P.C. answer due 12/15/2022; Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities) answer due 12/15/2022; Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities) answer due 12/15/2022; Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities) answer due 12/15/2022; Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities) answer due 12/15/2022.( Motions due by 12/15/2022.) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/18 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harpreet Kaur on behalf of Jennifer Deo(in their personal capacities), Jennifer Deo(in their professional capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their personal capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their professional capacities), Wexler Dermatology, P.C., Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities), Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities)..(Kaur, Harpreet)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/18 3:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,, . Document filed by Jennifer Deo(in their personal capacities), Jennifer Deo(in their professional capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their personal capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their professional capacities), Wexler Dermatology, P.C., Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities), Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities)..(Puccio, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/18 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Salvatore Puccio on behalf of Jennifer Deo(in their personal capacities), Jennifer Deo(in their professional capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their personal capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their professional capacities), Wexler Dermatology, P.C., Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities), Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities)..(Puccio, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/26 2:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jennifer Deo(in their personal capacities) waiver sent on 9/16/2022, answer due 11/15/2022; Jennifer Deo(in their professional capacities) waiver sent on 9/16/2022, answer due 11/15/2022; Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their personal capacities) waiver sent on 9/16/2022, answer due 11/15/2022; Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their professional capacities) waiver sent on 9/16/2022, answer due 11/15/2022; Wexler Dermatology, P.C. waiver sent on 9/16/2022, answer due 11/15/2022; Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities) waiver sent on 9/16/2022, answer due 11/15/2022; Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities) waiver sent on 9/16/2022, answer due 11/15/2022; Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities) waiver sent on 9/16/2022, answer due 11/15/2022; Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities) waiver sent on 9/16/2022, answer due 11/15/2022. Document filed by Madalyn Pedrosa..(Berlingieri, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 09/14 12:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jennifer Deo(in their personal capacities), Jennifer Deo(in their professional capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their personal capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their professional capacities), Wexler Dermatology, P.C., Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities), Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities). (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 09/14 12:01 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 09/14 12:01 PM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 09/14 12:01 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 09/13 7:18 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wexler Dermatology, P.C., Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities), Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities), Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their personal capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their professional capacities) and Jennifer Deo(in their personal capacities), Jennifer Deo(in their professional capacities), re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Madalyn Pedrosa..(Berlingieri, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/13 7:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berlingieri, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/13 7:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Jennifer Deo(in their personal capacities), Jennifer Deo(in their professional capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their personal capacities), Shari Goldstein-Behar(in their professional capacities), Wexler Dermatology, P.C., Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities), Eugene Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their personal capacities), Patricia Wexler, M.D.(in their professional capacities). (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26673736)Document filed by Madalyn Pedrosa..(Berlingieri, Christopher)
Related: [-]