Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Matthew W Mcfarland
Case #: 1:22-cv-00526
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2022
Terminated:Sep 15, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Mar 12, 2023 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Anomatic Corporation
8880 Innovation Campus Way
New Albany, OH 43054
Plaintiff
Mareiners, LLC
407 East 4th Street
Joseph, OR 97846
Represented By
Alex S. Rodger
Strauss Troy Co., Lpa
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 15, 2022
2 2 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/15 10:34 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: The Court, upon a review of the record, notes that the above-styled case was erroneously filed in the Southern District of Ohio, Western Division at Cincinnati. Pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 82.1(b), this case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Matthew W. McFarland to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 09/15/2022. (kaf)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - Divisional Thu 09/15 11:24 AM
Intra District Transfer - Case transferred to Eastern Division at Columbus as case number 2:22cv3433 This case has been closed and all future filings should be made in case number 2:22cv3433 (kaf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/13 5:31 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Anomatic Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9045532), filed by Mareiners, LLC. (Rodger, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Aug 15, 2017,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - US Patent,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet