Maryland District Court
Case #: 8:22-cr-00215
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 14, 2022 3:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Derrell Lamont Garrison (1)
Represented By
Peter S Fayne
Rosenberg And Fayne LLP
contact info
Cara Kurtz Halverson
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam Kenneth Ake
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info
Brian Zachary Mund
United States Attorney'S Office For The District Of Mar
contact info
Coreen Mao
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/14/2022 3:58 AM EDT
Thursday, June 16, 2022
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Derrell Lamont Garrison (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION and ORDER to Seal as to Derrell Lamont Garrison.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 6/16/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]