Scott v. Veillon
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Donald E Walter |
Referred: | Patrick J Hanna |
Case #: | 6:14-cv-02752 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Sep 17, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 3:18 AM CDT |
Defendant
John Ferald Gene Veillon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Scott
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, May 01, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations
Fri 05/01 1:37 PM
JUDGMENT ADOPTING13 Report and Recommendations. It is ORDERED that the captioned matter is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 5/1/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C) |
|
Monday, April 06, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 04/07 2:43 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re2 Complaint, filed by David Scott. Finding that the plaintiff has not borne his burden of establishing the court's subject-matter jurisdiction, the undersigned recommends that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 4/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/6/2015. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Monday, February 02, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order - Walter
Mon 02/02 3:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/26/2015 09:00 AM in xLafayette Court House before Judge Donald E Walter. Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2015 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Donald E Walter. Pretrial Order due by 9/21/2015. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 5/1/2015. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 5/18/2015. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 6/15/2015. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 6/29/2015. Discovery deadline 6/29/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2015. Expert Depositions due by 8/14/2015. Daubert Motions due by 8/14/2015. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 8/28/2015. Motions in Limine due by 9/11/2015. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 10/19/2015.. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 2/2/2015. (crt,Joffrion, B) |
|
Sunday, November 30, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 RESPONSE to Briefing Order by David Scott . (aty,Black, Bradley) | |
Thursday, November 06, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that on or before 11/30/2014, the plaintiff shall file a memorandum setting forth specific facts in controversy which support a finding that the jurisdictional amount threshold is satisfied. Supporting documentation and/or affidavits are advisable. A copy of the memorandum shall be provided to the undersigned and opposing counsel. Defendant will be allowed 10 days to reply to the plaintiffs arguments. Compliance Deadline set for 11/30/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/6/2014. (crt,Alexander, E) | |
Monday, November 03, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 (FILED IN ERROR) REQUEST for Production of Documents by John Ferald Gene Veillon.(aty,Brazee, James) Modified on 11/4/2014 to reflect "Filed in Error" (Dauterive, C). | |
8 | 8 (FILED IN ERROR)INTERROGATORIES Propounded to David Scott by John Ferald Gene Veillon.(aty,Brazee, James) Modified on 11/4/2014 to reflect "Filed in Error" (Dauterive, C). | |
7 | 7 RULE 26(f) Report by John Ferald Gene Veillon. (aty,Brazee, James) Modified text on 11/4/2014 (Yocum, M). | |
NOTICE of Corrective Action to James L Brazee, Jr on behalf of John Ferald Gene Veillon regarding9 Request for Production of Documents,8 Interrogatories Propounded. Action taken: Modified docket entries to reflect "Filed in Error"; Counsel is reminded of Local Rule 26.5 and FRCP5(d); local and federal rules do not allow routine filing of discovery, including disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) or (2). No further action on part of counsel is required. (crt,Dauterive, C) | ||
Wednesday, October 08, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 1 pgs MEMORANDUM ORDER that all requirements of FRCP 26(f) are hereby waived in this case. The parties are directed to serve their initial disclosures within 30 days and properly begin any necessary discovery and motion practices. A Scheduling Order will be issued by the Court setting the matter for trial in due course. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 10/8/2014. (crt,Joffrion, B) | |
Tuesday, October 07, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 ANSWER to2 Complaint, by John Ferald Gene Veillon.(aty,Brazee, James) | |
Tuesday, September 30, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER granting1 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel James L Brazee, Jr. and Evan Trigg Edwards for John Ferald Gene Veillon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/30/2014. (crt,Keifer, K) | |
Monday, September 29, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Ferald Gene Veillon. (crt,Whidden, C) | |
2 | 2 COMPLAINT against John Ferald Gene Veillon with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-2618859) filed by David Scott.(Attorney Bradley E Black added to party David Scott(pty:pla))(aty,Black, Bradley) Modified on 9/29/2014 to include fee payment and receipt number and to modify text (Whidden, C). | |
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
1 | 1 MOTION for James L. Brazee, Jr. to Enroll as Counsel by John Ferald Gene Veillon.(Attorney James L Brazee, Jr added to party John Ferald Gene Veillon(pty:dft))(aty,Brazee, James) | |
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
CASE Assigned to Judge Donald E Walter and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna.1 Motion to Enroll Counsel referred to Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Whidden, C) |